Vilca v. BTB Events & Celebrations, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nildo Vilca
Defendant: BTB Hospitality Corp., Ricky Eisen, Sean Martin, BTB Events & Celebrations, Inc. and Between the Bread 55th Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06577
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/6/2019) (kv)
September 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: BTB Events & Celebrations, Inc. answer due 9/30/2019; BTB Hospitality Corp. answer due 9/30/2019; Between the Bread 55th Inc. answer due 9/30/2019; Ricky Eisen answer due 9/30/2019; Sean Martin answer due 9/30/2019. (kv)
September 5, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Ian-Paul A. Poulos dated September 5, 2019. Document filed by BTB Events & Celebrations, Inc., BTB Hospitality Corp., Between the Bread 55th Inc., Ricky Eisen, Sean Martin.(Poulos, Ian-Paul)
August 29, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 9/30/2019.(mf)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/23/2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/28/2016) (mf)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/12/2019) (rj)
August 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: BTB Events & Celebrations, Inc. answer due 9/9/2019; BTB Hospitality Corp. answer due 9/9/2019; Between the Bread 55th Inc. answer due 9/9/2019; Ricky Eisen answer due 9/9/2019; Sean Martin answer due 9/9/2019. (rj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Ian-Paul A. Poulos dated August 9, 2019. Document filed by BTB Events & Celebrations, Inc., BTB Hospitality Corp., Between the Bread 55th Inc., Ricky Eisen, Sean Martin.(Poulos, Ian-Paul)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos on behalf of BTB Events & Celebrations, Inc., BTB Hospitality Corp., Between the Bread 55th Inc., Ricky Eisen, Sean Martin. (Poulos, Ian-Paul)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. BTB Hospitality Corp. served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Nildo Vilca. (Rapaport, Marc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Between the Bread 55th Inc. served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Nildo Vilca. (Rapaport, Marc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. BTB Events & Celebrations, Inc. served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Nildo Vilca. (Rapaport, Marc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Sean Martin served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. Service was accepted by Andrew Smith, a person of suitable age and discretion. Document filed by Nildo Vilca. (Rapaport, Marc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Ricky Eisen served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. Service was accepted by Andrew Smith, a person of suitable age and discretion. Document filed by Nildo Vilca. (Rapaport, Marc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sean Martin. (sj)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ricky Eisen. (sj)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Between the Bread 55th Inc.. (sj)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BTB Hospitality Corp.. (sj)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BTB Events & Celebrations, Inc.. (sj)
July 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean Martin, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nildo Vilca. (Rapaport, Marc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ricky Eisen, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nildo Vilca. (Rapaport, Marc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Between the Bread 55th Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nildo Vilca. (Rapaport, Marc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BTB Hospitality Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nildo Vilca. (Rapaport, Marc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BTB Events & Celebrations, Inc. d/b/a Between the Bread, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nildo Vilca. (Rapaport, Marc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rapaport, Marc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BTB Events & Celebrations, Inc., BTB Hospitality Corp., Between the Bread 55th Inc., Ricky Eisen, Sean Martin. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17247892)Document filed by Nildo Vilca.(Rapaport, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vilca v. BTB Events & Celebrations, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTB Hospitality Corp.
Represented By: Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Eisen
Represented By: Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Martin
Represented By: Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTB Events & Celebrations, Inc.
Represented By: Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Between the Bread 55th Inc.
Represented By: Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nildo Vilca
Represented By: Marc Andrew Rapaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?