Perala v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Lee Perala, Paul Perala and Sandra Perala
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet US, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, Zimmer Biomet Inc., Zimmer Inc. and Zimmer US, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06608
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Zimmer Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Zimmer US, Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Sandra Perala; Paul Perala. (Pittner, Laura)
July 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
July 22, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
July 22, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, Zimmer Inc., Zimmer US, Inc.. (pc)
July 19, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 18md2859. (pc)
July 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
July 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Laura Pittner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
July 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Laura Pittner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, Zimmer Biomet Inc., Zimmer Biomet US, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer U.S., Inc., and Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.,, re: #9 Complaint. Document filed by Paul Perala, Sandra Lee Perala. (Pittner, Laura)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, Zimmer Biomet Inc., Zimmer Biomet US, Inc.. Document filed by Sandra Lee Perala, Paul Perala.(Pittner, Laura)
July 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Laura Pittner to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the first page of the PDF attached for the Initial Pleading must be titled to indicate what type of document is being filed (COMPLAINT, SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, etc.). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/23/2019. (pne)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-MD-2859. Document filed by Paul Perala, Sandra Lee Perala.(Pittner, Laura)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pittner, Laura)
July 17, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Sandra Lee Perala, Paul Perala added. Party added pursuant to #5 Complaint.Document filed by Sandra Lee Perala, Paul Perala. Related document: #5 Complaint.(Pittner, Laura)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer U.S., Inc., and Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Sandra Lee Perala. (Pittner, Laura)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, Zimmer Biomet Inc., Zimmer Biomet US, Inc.. Document filed by Sandra Lee Perala.(Pittner, Laura) Modified on 7/18/2019 (pne).
July 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Laura Pittner to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF attached for the Initial Pleading does not indicate what type of document is being filed (Complaint, Short Form Complaint, etc.). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/22/2019. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS***(pne)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Laura Pittner on behalf of Sandra Lee Perala. (Pittner, Laura)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Pittner on behalf of Sandra Lee Perala. (Pittner, Laura)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pittner, Laura)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, Zimmer Biomet Inc., Zimmer Biomet US, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17253172)Document filed by Sandra Lee Perala.(Pittner, Laura) Modified on 7/17/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perala v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Lee Perala
Represented By: Laura Pittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Perala
Represented By: Laura Pittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Perala
Represented By: Laura Pittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?