Downie v. Lloyd's Underwriters et al
Plaintiff: Steve Downie
Defendant: Lloyd's Underwriters, HCC Specialty Underwriters, Inc. and HCC Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06620
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Rose Cuglietto on behalf of HCC Life Insurance Company, Inc., HCC Specialty Underwriters, Inc., Lloyd's Underwriters. (Cuglietto, Nicole)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. HCC Life Insurance Company, Inc. waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Document filed by HCC Life Insurance Company, Inc.. (Cuglietto, Nicole)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by HCC Specialty Underwriters, Inc.. (Cuglietto, Nicole)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lloyd's Underwriters waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Document filed by Lloyd's Underwriters. (Cuglietto, Nicole)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. HCC Specialty Underwriters, Inc. waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Document filed by HCC Specialty Underwriters, Inc.. (Cuglietto, Nicole)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Steve Downie waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Document filed by HCC Life Insurance Company, Inc.. (Cuglietto, Nicole)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HCC Specialty Underwriters, Inc.. (sj)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HCC Life Insurance Company, Inc.. (sj)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lloyd's Underwriters. (sj)
July 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michail Zolotoff Hack. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.. (sj)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HCC Specialty Underwriters, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steve Downie. (Hack, Michail)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HCC Life Insurance Company, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steve Downie. (Hack, Michail)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lloyd's Underwriters, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steve Downie. (Hack, Michail)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hack, Michail)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HCC Life Insurance Company, Inc., HCC Specialty Underwriters, Inc., Lloyd's Underwriters. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17254782)Document filed by Steve Downie.(Hack, Michail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downie v. Lloyd's Underwriters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd's Underwriters
Represented By: Nicole Rose Cuglietto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCC Specialty Underwriters, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Rose Cuglietto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCC Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Rose Cuglietto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Downie
Represented By: Michail Zolotoff Hack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?