Carvalho Calvelos v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Carvalho Calvelos
Defendant: Clement Glenn, Vaughn Grinnage, Surujdyal Rupnarain, Angel Villalona, CITY OF NEW YORK, Quincy Oudekerk, Willa Verabal, Mary Richards, Nadene Pinnock, Denise Phillips, Antonio Cruz and Deshanda Carter
Case Number: 1:2019cv06629
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #48 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. . Document filed by City Of New York, Clement Glenn, Vaughn Grinnage, Quincy Oudekerk, Denise Phillips, Nadene Pinnock, Mary Richards, Surujdyal Rupnarain, Willa Verabal, Angel Villalona. (Blair, Amanda)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DECLARATION of Amanda M. Blair in Support re: #48 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by City Of New York, Clement Glenn, Vaughn Grinnage, Quincy Oudekerk, Denise Phillips, Nadene Pinnock, Mary Richards, Surujdyal Rupnarain, Willa Verabal, Angel Villalona. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Personnel Determination Review Memo, #3 Exhibit Article 78 Petition, #4 Exhibit Use of Force Incident Log, #5 Exhibit Use of Force Directive, #6 Exhibit Doctor's Note, #7 Exhibit Pl.'s Interdepartmental Memo, #8 Exhibit Incident Report Form, #9 Exhibit Personnel Determination Review)(Blair, Amanda)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by City Of New York, Clement Glenn, Vaughn Grinnage, Quincy Oudekerk, Denise Phillips, Nadene Pinnock, Mary Richards, Surujdyal Rupnarain, Willa Verabal, Angel Villalona.(Blair, Amanda)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Blair on behalf of Clement Glenn, Vaughn Grinnage, Quincy Oudekerk, Denise Phillips, Nadene Pinnock, Mary Richards, Surujdyal Rupnarain, Willa Verabal, Angel Villalona. (Blair, Amanda)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/10/2019) (mml)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Amanda M. Blair dated 9/9/2019. Document filed by City Of New York.(Blair, Amanda)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/15/2019) (kv)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mohammad Adil Yaqoob on behalf of City Of New York. (Yaqoob, Mohammad)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/9/2019) (mml)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Deshanda Carter answer due 9/14/2019; City Of New York answer due 9/14/2019; Antonio Cruz answer due 9/14/2019; Clement Glenn answer due 9/14/2019; Vaughn Grinnage answer due 9/14/2019; Quincy Oudekerk answer due 9/14/2019; Denise Phillips answer due 9/14/2019; Nadene Pinnock answer due 9/14/2019; Mary Richards answer due 9/14/2019; Surujdyal Rupnarain answer due 9/14/2019; Willa Verabal answer due 9/14/2019; Angel Villalona answer due 9/14/2019. (mml)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Amanda M. Blair dated 8/8/2019. Document filed by City Of New York.(Blair, Amanda)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Blair on behalf of City Of New York. (Blair, Amanda)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Deshanda Carter served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019; Antonio Cruz served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019; Clement Glenn served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019; Vaughn Grinnage served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019; Quincy Oudekerk served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019; Denise Phillips served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019; Nadene Pinnock served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019; Mary Richards served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019; Surujdyal Rupnarain served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019; Willa Verabal served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019; Angel Villalona served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. Service was accepted by Officer Cornetto. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. City Of New York served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Surujdyal Rupnarain. (dnh)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Surujdyal Rupnarain, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mary Richards. (dnh)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Willa Verabal. (dnh)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Quincy Oudekerk. (dnh)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vaughn Grinnage. (dnh)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Denise Phillips. (dnh)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clement Glenn. (dnh)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deshanda Carter. (dnh)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Philip Michael Hines to RE-FILE Document No. #26 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the defendant name listed in the as to docket entry and on the summons PDF contains a typographical error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Uri Nazryan on behalf of Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Nazryan, Uri)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hines, Philip)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Suruidyal Rupnarain, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip) Modified on 7/18/2019 (dnh).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mary Richards, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Willa Verabal, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Quincy Oudekerk, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vaughn Grinnage, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Denise Phillips, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Clement Glenn, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Deshanda Carter, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Angel Villalona. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Antonio Cruz. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nadene Pinnock. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Philip Michael Hines to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip Michael Hines. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17256284, paid on 07/16/2019. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Philip Michael Hines. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CITY OF NEW YORK. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Philip Michael Hines to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the party name listed in the 'To:' section must exactly match the party of records. Do not include party titles that are not listed on the pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Angel Villalona, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Antonio Cruz, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nadene Pinnock, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Deshanda Carter, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Surujdyal Rupnarain, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Willa Verabal, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Quincy Oudekerk, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vaughn Grinnage, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mary Richards, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Denise Phillips, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Clement Glenn, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos. (Hines, Philip)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hines, Philip) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF NEW YORK, Deshanda Carter, Antonio Cruz, Clement Glenn, Vaughn Grinnage, Quincy Oudekerk, Denise Phillips, Nadene Pinnock, Mary Richards, Surujdyal Rupnarain, Willa Verabal, Angel Villalona. Document filed by Manuel Carvalho Calvelos.(Hines, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carvalho Calvelos v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement Glenn
Represented By: Amanda Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughn Grinnage
Represented By: Amanda Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surujdyal Rupnarain
Represented By: Amanda Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Villalona
Represented By: Amanda Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Mohammad Adil Yaqoob
Represented By: Amanda Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Oudekerk
Represented By: Amanda Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willa Verabal
Represented By: Amanda Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Richards
Represented By: Amanda Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadene Pinnock
Represented By: Amanda Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Phillips
Represented By: Amanda Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deshanda Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Carvalho Calvelos
Represented By: Philip Michael Hines
Represented By: Uri Nazryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?