Spadafora et al v. Standard Fire Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Gudelia Levine and Joseph Spadafora
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company, The Standard Fire Insurance Company and Standard Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv06631
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Eric Dinnocenzo. RE-FILE Document No. #7 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Document should be titiled as a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, not a Stipulaiton of Volubtary Dismiss, it is only signed by Plaintiffs attorney, not the Defendants. Change Title of Document to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, then Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (dt)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Travelers Indemnity Company and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Joseph Spadafora, Gudelia Levine. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)..(Dinnocenzo, Eric) Modified on 9/10/2019 (dt).
August 23, 2019 Minute Entry. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the initial pre-trial conference currently scheduled for September 17, 2019 is adjourned to October 18, 2019 at 4:00 pm. The proposed case management plan and joint letter described in the Court's July 18, 2019 order are due no later than October 11, 2019. (Daniels, Anthony)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Standard Fire Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019; Travelers Indemnity Company waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Document filed by Joseph Spadafora ; Gudelia Levine. (Dinnocenzo, Eric)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/18/2019) (anc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Standard Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Eric John Dinnocenzo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Standard Fire Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: Exclude from the entry of business name any leading A, An or The.. (dnh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dinnocenzo, Eric)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Standard Fire Insurance Company and Travelers Indemnity Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gudelia Levine, Joseph Spadafora. (Dinnocenzo, Eric)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Standard Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17256955)Document filed by Joseph Spadafora, Gudelia Levine.(Dinnocenzo, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spadafora et al v. Standard Fire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gudelia Levine
Represented By: Eric John Dinnocenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Spadafora
Represented By: Eric John Dinnocenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?