Downey v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv06646
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Mailed a copy of #5 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), #4 Order of Dismissal,with Notice of Right to Appeal to Mark Downey Drawer SS McLean, VA 22101-0729. (aea)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), (ii). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/5/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND TO SHOW CAUSE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1651. The Clerk is directed to assign these matters to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket in both cases. The Court consolidates these two actions for the purpose of this order. The Clerk of Court is further instructed enter judgment in 19-CV-6646 (CM), and to hold 19-CV-5985 (CM) open on the docket until a civil judgment is entered. The complaints, filed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), are dismissed as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), (ii). Plaintiff shall have thirty days to show cause by declaration, in 19-CV-5985 (CM), why an order should not be entered barring Plaintiff from filing any future action in forma pauperis in this Court without prior permission. A declaration form is attached to this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this as a "written opinion" within the meaning of Section 205(a)(5) of the E-Government Act of 2002. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/2/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 5, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:19-cv-05985-CM. (rjm)
August 2, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
July 18, 2019 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Granting IFP Application to Mark Downey Drawer SS McLean, VA 22101-0729. (aea)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/18/2019) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United States of America. Document filed by Mark Downey.(rdz) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/17/2019) (rdz).
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Mark Downey.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downey v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?