Ayitey v. Empress Ambulance Service Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Regina Ayitey
Defendant: Shirece Clarke and Empress Ambulance Service Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06657
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332pr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Kevin Acheampong dated September 9, 2019 re: 1:19-cv-06657 Withdrawal of Notice of Removal. Document filed by Shirece Clarke, Empress Ambulance Service Inc..(Acheampong, Kevin)
August 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 12, 2019 Transmission to Case Assignment Clerk. Transmitted re: #4 Amended Civil Case Administrative Closing Order,,,,, to the Case Assignment Clerk for preparation of notice of case assignment/reassignment. (pc)
August 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kevin Acheampong. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $9,999,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Westchester; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal and Notice of Removal served on Law Offices of Herman Caceres, PLLC on 08-08-2019. Document filed by Shirece Clarke, Empress Ambulance Service Inc.. (Acheampong, Kevin)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPLICATION TO REOPEN CASE: Pursuant to Amended Standing Order (15-MC-131):. The deficiency(ies) has been cured and the party(ies) seek to reopen the civil case. (Acheampong, Kevin)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 24969/2019E..Document filed by Shirece Clarke, Empress Ambulance Service Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Affidavits of Service of S&C, #4 Exhibit Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief, #5 Exhibit Letter of Good Faith, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Demand for Total Damages, #7 Supplement Police Accident Report)(Acheampong, Kevin)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 10/7/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/2017) (pne)
August 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kevin Acheampong to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; if the PDF is being titled "Petition for Removal", parties must be named as petitioner(s) and respondent(s), otherwise title the document "Notice of Removal". Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS***. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/23/2019. (pne)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Acheampong, Kevin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Shirece Clarke, Empress Ambulance Service Inc..(Acheampong, Kevin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 24969/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17260762).Document filed by Shirece Clarke, Empress Ambulance Service Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Affidavits of Service of S&C, #4 Exhibit Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief, #5 Exhibit Letter of Good Faith, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Demand for Total Damages, #7 Exhibit Police Report)(Acheampong, Kevin) Modified on 7/18/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayitey v. Empress Ambulance Service Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirece Clarke
Represented By: Kevin Acheampong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empress Ambulance Service Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Acheampong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Ayitey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?