White et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael James White and Becky Ann White
Defendant: Zimmer Inc., Zimmer US, Inc. and Zimmer Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06730
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sandberg, Peter)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Holdings Inc., Zimmer Inc., Zimmer US, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17312838)Document filed by Michael James White, Becky Ann White. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sandberg, Peter)
July 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
July 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
July 19, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
July 19, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
July 19, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
July 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Alaska; Case Number: 3:19-cv-00161. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-17): Pursuant to Rule 7. I of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of New York for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Paul A. Crotty. (CME, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 7/19/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 SLG TEXT ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion to stay proceedings and answer deadline pending transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. All proceedings in this action are hereby STAYED; and the July 8, 2019, deadline to file an Answer to the Complaint is hereby STRICKEN. (RMC, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 7/19/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit B - CTO)(Baxter, Lee) [Transferred from Alaska on 7/19/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Colin Baxter on behalf of Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (Baxter, Lee) [Transferred from Alaska on 7/19/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 7/19/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Zimmer, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Zimmer Holdings, Inc., #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Zimmer U.S., Inc.)(PXS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 7/19/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (Sandberg, Peter) [Transferred from Alaska on 7/19/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Becky Ann White, Michael James White. (Sandberg, Peter) [Transferred from Alaska on 7/19/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2710409.), filed by Michael James White, Becky Ann White.(Sandberg, Peter) [Transferred from Alaska on 7/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James White
Represented By: Peter A. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Ann White
Represented By: Peter A. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Inc.
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?