Wood v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gerald L. Wood
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. and Zimmer US, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06743
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
July 25, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
July 25, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer, Inc.. (jgo)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US, Inc.. (jgo)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (jgo)
July 23, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 18-md-2859. (jgo)
July 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. Document filed by Gerald L. Wood.(Osborne, Joseph)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph A. Osborne to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF must be titled and correspond with the event type. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/29/2019. (jgo)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gerald L. Wood. (Osborne, Joseph)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gerald L. Wood. (Osborne, Joseph)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gerald L. Wood. (Osborne, Joseph)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-MD-2859. Document filed by Gerald L. Wood.(Osborne, Joseph)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Osborne, Joseph)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17276139)Document filed by Gerald L. Wood.(Osborne, Joseph) Modified on 7/22/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald L. Wood
Represented By: Joseph A. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?