United States of America v. B H & B Construction Inc.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: B H & B CONSTRUCTION INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06835
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to B H & B Construction Inc. (km)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of John Manfredi re: #11 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default . Document filed by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by United States of America. (Manfredi, John) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
September 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney John Manfredi. RE-FILE Document No. #10 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The clerk's certificate is not correctly filled out. The line where is says the summons and complaint was served on defendant______ (enter defaulting defendant's name). The attorney declaration in support of the clerk's certificate needs to be filed as a separate entry (filed under other answers, declaration in support of a non-motion). (km)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 affidavit in support) (Manfredi, John) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 9/16/2019 (km).
September 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney John Manfredi. RE-FILE Document No. #9 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The clerk's certificate is not correctly filled out. The line where is says the summons and complaint was served on defendant______ (enter defaulting defendant's name). The next line where it says by personally serving______ (enter the name of the person who accepted service for defendant. Your proof of service states it was someone other than the defendant). An attorney affidavit in support of the clerk's certificate needs to be filed as a separate entry (filed under other answers, affidavit in support of a non-motion). (km)
September 15, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by United States of America. (Manfredi, John) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 9/16/2019 (km).
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. B H & B Construction Inc. served on 8/5/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky authorized by NYS Secretary of State. Document filed by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. B H & B Construction Inc. served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. Service was accepted by John Smith on behalf of corporate Defendant (refused name). Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 affidavit of service on registered agent)(Manfredi, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to B H & B Construction Inc.. (pne)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/24/2019) (rj)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to B H & B Construction Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
July 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Stephen Manfredi to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the name of the party for whom the summons is being requested must be entered in the docket entry text. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
July 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Stephen Manfredi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: B H & B Construction Inc., United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
July 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Stephen Manfredi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Cause of Action code 31:3545; Nature of Suit code 790 (Labor: Other); County code Bronx; Fee Status code pd (paid). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff); the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1345; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 690 (Forfeit/Penalty: Other); the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived). (pne)
July 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
July 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Manfredi, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Manfredi, John) Modified on 7/24/2019 (pne).
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B H & B CONSTRUCTION INC.. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit b)(Manfredi, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. B H & B Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B H & B CONSTRUCTION INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: John Stephen Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?