Hazan v. Unum Group
Plaintiff: Victor Hazan
Defendant: Unum Group
Case Number: 1:2019cv06954
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332ct
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew I. Hamelsky on behalf of Unum Group. (Hamelsky, Andrew)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric M Davis on behalf of Victor Hazan. (Davis, Eric)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order served on Victor Hazan on August 2, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Unum Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter, #2 Exhibit Order)(Scarcella, Jenifer)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference; Individual Rules of Practice served on Victor Hazan on August 2, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Unum Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter, #2 Exhibit Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference, #3 Exhibit Individual Rules of Practice)(Scarcella, Jenifer)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court's Order of July 26, 2019, directed Defendant to serve a copy of that Order on Plaintiff and to file proof of such service on the docket within two business days. ECF No. 5. No such proof of service appears on the docket. It is therefore ORDERED that - if Defendant did serve that Order on Plaintiff - Defendant file proof of such service immediately, or if that Order has not yet been served on Plaintiff - that Defendant serve a copy of that Order and this one on Plaintiff through his counsel and file proof of such service on ECF within one business day of the date of this Order. As before, Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to file a notice of appearance on the docket within two business days of such service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/2/2019) (ne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer served on Victor Hazan on August 1, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Unum Group. (Scarcella, Jenifer)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Unum Group.(Scarcella, Jenifer)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/23/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/26/2019) (ne)
July 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jenifer Ann Scarcella. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $848,350,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $848,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Rule 7.1 Statement, Civil Cover Sheet served on Victor Hazan on July 25, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Unum Group. (Scarcella, Jenifer)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Scarcella, Jenifer)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Unum Group.(Scarcella, Jenifer)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 653649/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17312295).Document filed by Unum Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Service of Process)(Scarcella, Jenifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hazan v. Unum Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Jenifer Ann Scarcella
Represented By: Andrew I. Hamelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Hazan
Represented By: Eric M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?