Boyd et al v. Zimmer, Inc et al
Plaintiff: James Gayda and Sheryl Boyd
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc and Zimmer US, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv07005
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
August 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 13, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer, Inc. (dnh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sheryl Boyd, James Gayda. (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brenda S. Fulmer to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the summons request docket entry must reflect the party as to whom the summons is being issued. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (dnh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US, Inc. (dnh)
July 29, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (dnh)
July 29, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 29, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sheryl Boyd, James Gayda. (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sheryl Boyd, James Gayda. (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sheryl Boyd, James Gayda. (Fulmer, Brenda) Modified on 7/29/2019 (dnh).
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-MD-2859. Document filed by Sheryl Boyd, James Gayda.(Fulmer, Brenda)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc, Zimmer, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17321887)Document filed by Sheryl Boyd, James Gayda.(Fulmer, Brenda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd et al v. Zimmer, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gayda
Represented By: Brenda S. Fulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Boyd
Represented By: Brenda S. Fulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?