Bell v. National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Plaintiff: Catherine Bell
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07057
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by C. Perrin Rome, III on behalf of Catherine Bell. (Rome, C.)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for C. Perrin Rome, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney must file a Notice of Appearance. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jqw)
August 29, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 CONSENT MOTION for C. Perrin Rome, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17512816. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT MOTION for C. Perrin Rome, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17512816. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Catherine Bell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Marc Wietzke, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Perrin Rome, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Perrin Rome, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Perrin Rome, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Perrin Rome, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wietzke, Marc)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Colin Pei Kai Be' on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (Be', Colin)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate American Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Passenger Railroad Insurance Limited, Other Affiliate Washington Terminal Company, Other Affiliate Canadian Pacific Railway, Other Affiliate American Premier Underwriters, Inc., Other Affiliate Burlington Northern and Sante Fe LLC, Other Affiliate Canadian National Railway, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway for National Railroad Passenger Corp.. Document filed by National Railroad Passenger Corp..(Bonventre, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by National Railroad Passenger Corp..(Bonventre, John)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 11:00 a.m., on October 8, 2019, in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/01/2019) (ama)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by October 1, 2019, email a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by October 1, 2019, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/01/2019) (ama)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (dnh)
July 30, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wietzke, Marc)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Railroad Passenger Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Catherine Bell. (Wietzke, Marc)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17330279)Document filed by Catherine Bell.(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Bell
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Represented By: C. Perrin Rome, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Represented By: John Anthony Bonventre
Represented By: Colin Pei Kai Be'
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?