Homestyle Hospitality LLC v. Great Lakes Insurance Company SE
Plaintiff: Homestyle Hospitality LLC
Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance Company SE and Great Lakes Insurance Reinsurance
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Great Lakes Insurance Company SE a/k/a Great Lakes Insurance Reinsurance (UK) SE
Case Number: 1:2019cv07092
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Craig A. Blumberg and Eric R. Leibowitz dated 09/27/2019 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Homestyle Hospitality LLC.(Blumberg, Craig)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Great Lakes Insurance Company SE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Leibowitz, Eric)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. The Court has reviewed Defendant's response to the Court's August 1, 2019 order to show cause. It is not clear from Defendant's response that there are no other members of Homestyle Hospitality, LLC besides Mr. Ciuffetelli and that those other members, if any, would necessarily be diverse from Defendant. However, to the extent necessary, the Court will take up the issue of any jurisdictional discovery during the initial pre-trial conference currently scheduled for October 7, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on August 15, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Homestyle Hospitality LLC(Blumberg, Craig)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/9/2019) (jca)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County on July 30, 2019. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than August 30, 2019. Additionally, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Defendant is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/9/2019) (ks)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig A Blumberg on behalf of Homestyle Hospitality LLC. (Blumberg, Craig)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 Letter filed by Great Lakes Insurance Company SE. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to August 20, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/6/2019) (jca)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Affirmation in Response to Order to Show Cause served on Craig A. Blumberg, Esq. on August 6, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Great Lakes Insurance Company SE. (Leibowitz, Eric)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #7 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Great Lakes Insurance Company SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - ER Quinn Company Report, #3 Exhibit C - LexisNexus Search Results)(Leibowitz, Eric)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Eric Leibowitz dated August 5, 2019 re: Requesting Extension of Time to File Answer. Document filed by Great Lakes Insurance Company SE.(Leibowitz, Eric)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, Defendant is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by August 6, 2019 why this action should not be remanded to the Supreme Court of New York, New York County. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/01/2019) (ama)
August 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
August 1, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance Company for Great Lakes Insurance Company SE. Document filed by Great Lakes Insurance Company SE.(Leibowitz, Eric)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Craig A. Blumberg, Esquire on 7/30/19. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Great Lakes Insurance Company SE. (Leibowitz, Eric)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Eric Ronald Leibowitz to RE-FILE Document #2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Leibowitz, Eric)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 156381/2019..Document filed by Great Lakes Insurance Company SE. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint)(Leibowitz, Eric)
July 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Eric Ronald Leibowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Great Lakes Insurance Company SE. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Eric Ronald Leibowitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Citizenship Plaintiff code - no selection; Citizenship Defendant code - no selection; Dollar Demand none; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity); the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5000000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (jgo)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Eric Ronald Leibowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Eric Ronald Leibowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, all exhibits must be labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Great Lakes Insurance Company SE a/k/a Great Lakes Insurance Reinsurance (UK) SE.(Leibowitz, Eric) Modified on 7/31/2019 (ldi).
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - EXHIBIT ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 156381/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17337008).Document filed by Great Lakes Insurance Company SE a/k/a Great Lakes Insurance Reinsurance (UK) SE. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leibowitz, Eric) Modified on 7/31/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homestyle Hospitality LLC v. Great Lakes Insurance Company SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Great Lakes Insurance Company SE a/k/a Great Lakes Insurance Reinsurance (UK) SE
Represented By: Eric Ronald Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homestyle Hospitality LLC
Represented By: Craig A Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance Company SE
Represented By: Eric Ronald Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance Reinsurance
Represented By: Eric Ronald Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?