Wieman v. Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Elmo John Wieman
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv07096
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Patrick Constable on behalf of Elmo John Wieman. (Constable, Sean)
September 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/24/2019, ( Status Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels.). Plaintiff Counsel: Sean Consley Defense Counsel: Thomas Chiofolo and Court Reporter present. (Vega, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULE: Amended Pleadings due by 11/5/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 11/5/2019. Motions due by 2/4/2020. Discovery due by 1/7/2020. Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2020 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. Status Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. Pretrial Order due by 3/3/2020. Ready for Trial by 4/7/2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/13/2019) (ks)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Elmo John Wieman.(Wietzke, Marc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Complaint. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company.(Chiofolo, Thomas)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges & Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Metro North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit for Long Island Railroad Company. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company.(Chiofolo, Thomas)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/31/2019) (jca)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Island Railroad Company. (pne)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Elmo John Wieman. (Wietzke, Marc)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Marc Twyman Wietzke to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; include 'c/o' or 'via' before second party name (c/o Jamaica Station). Summons must be linked to the pleading accepted by the court #4 Complaint.. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Marc Twyman Wietzke to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; The parties listed on the PDF do not correspond with the parties entered on CM/ECF. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/5/2019. (dnh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company. Document filed by Elmo John Wieman.(Wietzke, Marc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wietzke, Marc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elmo John Wieman. (Wietzke, Marc) Modified on 7/31/2019 (dnh).
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17337658)Document filed by Elmo John Wieman.(Wietzke, Marc) Modified on 7/31/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wieman v. Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: Thomas Chiofolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmo John Wieman
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Represented By: Sean Patrick Constable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?