Marcus v. Archer et al
Plaintiff: Clark Marcus
Defendant: Johnny D. Lancaster, James Madden, Johnny Patout, Melynda Boothe, Laura F. Tarantino, Scott E. Gressett, Stuart Archer, Franklin Roemer II, Daryl J. Doise and Adrian Fisher
Case Number: 1:2019cv07099
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 COMPLAINT against Stuart Archer, Melynda Boothe, Daryl J. Doise, Adrian Fisher, Scott E. Gressett, Johnny D. Lancaster, James Madden, Johnny Patout, Franklin Roemer II, Laura F. Tarantino. Document filed by Clark Marcus.(Oshinsky, Jerold)
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Jerold Oshinsky dated September 26, 2019. Document filed by Clark Marcus.(Oshinsky, Jerold)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2019, IS HEREBY ADJOURNED TO NOVEMBER 22, 2019, AT 12:15 P.M. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Park, Isaac)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from John A. Jordak, Jr. dated September 12, 2019. Document filed by Stuart Archer, Melynda Boothe, Daryl J. Doise, Scott E. Gressett, Laura F. Tarantino.(Jordak, John)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 26, 2019. THE DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE WITHIN FORTY-FIVE DAYS OF THE DATE OF FILING OF THE COMPLAINT. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Jerold Oshinsky dated August 26, 2019 re: #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file complaint and responses thereto addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Louis Brett Goldman dated 8/26/2019. . Document filed by Clark Marcus. (Oshinsky, Jerold)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file complaint and responses thereto addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Louis Brett Goldman dated 8/26/2019. Document filed by Adrian Fisher, Johnny D. Lancaster, James Madden, Johnny Patout, Franklin Roemer II.(Goldman, Louis)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on September 19, 2019, at 12:00 p.m. The conference will be held in Courtroom 706 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Court House, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/21/2019) (js)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerold Oshinsky on behalf of Clark Marcus. (Oshinsky, Jerold)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notices of Appearances served on Plaintiff on August 1, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Stuart Archer, Melynda Boothe, Daryl J. Doise, Scott E. Gressett, Laura F. Tarantino. (Lorenzo, Alexander)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Gingold Clark on behalf of Stuart Archer, Melynda Boothe, Daryl J. Doise, Scott E. Gressett, Laura F. Tarantino. (Clark, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Seton Lorenzo on behalf of Stuart Archer, Melynda Boothe, Daryl J. Doise, Scott E. Gressett, Laura F. Tarantino. (Lorenzo, Alexander)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Allen Jordak, Jr on behalf of Stuart Archer, Melynda Boothe, Daryl J. Doise, Scott E. Gressett, Laura F. Tarantino. (Jordak, John)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case was removed from New York Supreme Court, New York County, on July 30, 2019. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to file an appearance with this Court no later than August 16, 2019. Counsel for the removing defendants shall serve a copy of this order on counsel for the plaintiff by August 9, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/31/2019) (ne)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 156553/2019..Document filed by Melynda Boothe, Adrian Fisher, Scott E. Gressett, Franklin Roemer II, Johnny D. Lancaster, Stuart Archer, Johnny Patout, Laura F. Tarantino, James Madden, Daryl J. Doise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Summons with Notice, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Goldman, Louis)
July 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Louis Brett Goldman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1332t; Dollar Demand 9,999,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332nr; the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Louis Brett Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Goldman, Louis)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 156553/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17338022).Document filed by Melynda Boothe, Adrian Fisher, Scott E. Gressett, Franklin Roemer II, Johnny D. Lancaster, Stuart Archer, Johnny Patout, Laura F. Tarantino, James Madden, Daryl J. Doise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons with Notice, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Goldman, Louis) Modified on 7/31/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcus v. Archer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny D. Lancaster
Represented By: Louis Brett Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Madden
Represented By: Louis Brett Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Patout
Represented By: Louis Brett Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melynda Boothe
Represented By: Elizabeth Gingold Clark
Represented By: Alexander Seton Lorenzo
Represented By: John Allen Jordak, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura F. Tarantino
Represented By: Elizabeth Gingold Clark
Represented By: Alexander Seton Lorenzo
Represented By: John Allen Jordak, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott E. Gressett
Represented By: Elizabeth Gingold Clark
Represented By: Alexander Seton Lorenzo
Represented By: John Allen Jordak, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Archer
Represented By: Elizabeth Gingold Clark
Represented By: Alexander Seton Lorenzo
Represented By: John Allen Jordak, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Roemer II
Represented By: Louis Brett Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl J. Doise
Represented By: Elizabeth Gingold Clark
Represented By: Alexander Seton Lorenzo
Represented By: John Allen Jordak, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Fisher
Represented By: Louis Brett Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark Marcus
Represented By: Jerold Oshinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?