Ahmad v. Cuccinelli et al
Plaintiff: Afroz Ahmad
Defendant: Acting USCIS Distric Lee F. Bowes, Acting Director of U Kevin T. Cuccinelli, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Lee F. Bowes and Kevin McAleenan
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Secretary of DHS
Case Number: 1:2019cv07114
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lee F. Bowes, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan. (gp)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin McAleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Lee F. Bowes, re: #2 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Afroz Ahmad. (Chan, Evangeline)
August 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Evangeline M. Chan to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; enter all the parties names the Summons is to be issued for when prompted. The docket entry must reflect all of the parties as to whom the summons is being requested. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Afroz Ahmad, re: #2 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Afroz Ahmad. (Chan, Evangeline) Modified on 8/16/2019 (vf).
August 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Evangeline M. Chan to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; if the defendant party text is listed on the summons PDF it must appear exactly as it reads in the caption on the initial pleading. 'As to' Error; the 'as to' docket entry must reflect all of the parties as to whom the summons is being requested. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Afroz Ahmad, re: #2 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Afroz Ahmad. (Chan, Evangeline) Modified on 8/15/2019 (dnh).
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court has received Ahmad's petition for a writ of mandamus. See Dkt. 1. The Court orders respondents to respond by September 1, 2019. Petitioner is directed to serve respondents with a copy of this Order by August 7, 2019, and to promptly file an affidavit of such service on the docket of this case. (Lee F. Bowes answer due 9/1/2019; Kevin T. Cuccinelli answer due 9/1/2019; Kevin McAleenan answer due 9/1/2019.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/1/2019) (jwh)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Evangeline M. Chan to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; caption must match exactly as it appear on pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
July 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Evangeline M. Chan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:0706; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 05:555; the County code has been modified to Nassau. (sj)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Evangeline M. Chan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kevin McAleenan; Kenneth T. Cuccinelli; Lee F. Bowes. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (sj)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin McAleenan; Kenneth T. Cuccinelli; Lee F. Bowes, re: #2 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Afroz Ahmad. (Chan, Evangeline) Modified on 7/31/2019 (sj).
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Chan, Evangeline)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Lee F. Bowes, Kevin T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Secretary of DHS.Document filed by Afroz Ahmad.(Chan, Evangeline)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Evangeline M. Chan to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Petition (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/5/2019. (sj)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Evangeline M. Chan. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17339753).Document filed by Afroz Ahmad.(Chan, Evangeline) Modified on 7/31/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmad v. Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting USCIS Distric Lee F. Bowes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director of U Kevin T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee F. Bowes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Secretary of DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Afroz Ahmad
Represented By: Evangeline M. Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?