Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp. v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp.
Defendant: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company and Sonny's Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv07117
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201dj
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #17 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Sonny's Enterprises, LLC pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)..(Nicolini, John)
September 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney John Nicolini. RE-FILE Document No. #16 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Must E-File a Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal signed (Signatures) by both Attorneys, Sonny Enterpriises, LLC filed an Answer, so the dismissal has to be done by Stipulaiton and not a Notice. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (dt)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Sonny's Enterprises, LLC pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)..(Nicolini, John)
September 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney John Nicolini. RE-FILE Document No. #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Answer filed must be done by Stipulaiotn and must have Attorneys Signatures, no /s/ or electronic signatures. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (dt)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - RESPONSIVE PLEADING FILED - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Sonny's Enterprises, LLC. Document filed by Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Nicolini, John) Modified on 9/5/2019 (dt).
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #4 Complaint. Document filed by Sonny's Enterprises, LLC.(Gerber, Andrew)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sonny's Holdings, LLC for Sonny's Enterprises, LLC. Document filed by Sonny's Enterprises, LLC.(Gerber, Andrew)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. Service was accepted by Robert Freedman. Document filed by Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp.. (Nicolini, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. Service was accepted by David D. Hess, Director, Claim Counsel RLI Insurance/Mt. Hawley Insurance. Document filed by Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp.. (Nicolini, John)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Sonny's Enterprises, LLC served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp.. (Nicolini, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, Sonny's Enterprises, LLC. (jgo)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company and Sonny's Enterprises LLC., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp.. (Nicolini, John)
August 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Jerome Nicolini to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): List BOTH parties you are requesting a summons form on the summons form and docket entry for the summons not et al. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, et.al., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp.. (Nicolini, John) Modified on 8/6/2019 (pc).
August 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Jerome Nicolini to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption Error; the caption on the summons PDF must exactly match the caption on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company et. al., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp.. (Nicolini, John) Modified on 8/2/2019 (dnh).
August 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Jerome Nicolini to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the wrong parties as to whom the summons is being filed against were selected. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp.. (Nicolini, John) Modified on 8/1/2019 (dnh).
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, Sonny's Enterprises, LLC. Document filed by Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp..(Nicolini, John)
July 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Robert Ferretti. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:8705; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:2201; the County code has been modified to Bronx. (sj)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Robert Ferretti. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John Robert Ferretti to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from John J. Nicolini dated 07/30/2019 re: Related Action (19 cv 2975). Document filed by Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp..(Ferretti, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ferretti, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Peoria, IL), Sonny's Enterprises, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17339822)Document filed by Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons & Complaint in underlying action, #2 Exhibit B: Answer in underlying action, #3 Exhibit C: Disclaimer, #4 Exhibit D: Insurance Policy)(Ferretti, John) Modified on 7/31/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp. v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ultimatech Car Wash Equipment Corp.
Represented By: John Robert Ferretti
Represented By: John Jerome Nicolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny's Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Isaac Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?