American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. et al v. Goodfriend et al
Plaintiff: CBS Broadcasting Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, Fox Televisions Stations, LLC, Disney Enterprises, Inc, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Television LLC, CBS Studios Inc. and American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.
Defendant: David R. Goodfriend and Sports Fans Coalition NY, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07136
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Alexander Paul Okuliar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17678649. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 27, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Alexander Paul Okuliar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17678649. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David R. Goodfriend, Sports Fans Coalition NY, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Okuliar in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Texas), #3 Exhibit Certificatre of Good Standing (District of Columbia), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Okuliar, Alexander)
September 26, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by David R. Goodfriend, Sports Fans Coalition NY, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Locast Website, Homepage, #2 Exhibit 2 - Locast Website, Outside DMA Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 - Locast Program Guide, #4 Exhibit 4 - Locast User Comments, Facebook, #5 Exhibit 5 - Requests for Locast, Facebook, #6 Exhibit 6 - SFCNY Charitable Corporation Certificate, #7 Exhibit 7 - SFCNY Form 1023, #8 Exhibit 8 - SFCNY IRS Determination Letter, #9 Exhibit 9 - Locast Website, Donation Information, #10 Exhibit 10 - SFCNY Form 990-EZ, #11 Exhibit 11 - SFCNY Bylaws)(Hosp, R.)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #25 Motion for Mark S. Puzella to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/11/2019) (mro)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #24 Motion for Sheryl Koval Garko to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/11/2019) (mro)
August 27, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Sheryl Koval Garko to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17498436. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #25 MOTION for Mark S. Puzella to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number ANYSDC-17498944. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 27, 2019 REMARK: The Rule 16b conference is adjourned until further notice. (ml) Modified on 8/27/2019 (ml).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by the attorneys for Plaintiffs American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Fox Television Stations, LLC, Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Universal Television LLC, and Open 4 Business Productions, LLC (collectively, "Plaintiffs") and Defendants David R. Goodfriend and Sports Fans Coalition NY, Inc. (collectively, "Defendants") that Defendants be granted an extension of time up to and including September 27, 2019 to serve an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Counsel for Defendants agreed to accept service of the summonses as of August 12, 2019, making September 2, 2019 the original due date for a response to the Complaint. The request for an extension is made because of defense counsel's trial commitments. This is the first request for an extension of time. Plaintiffs and Defendants respectfully request that the Court enter the above Stipulation as the Order of the Court. SO ORDERED. (David R. Goodfriend answer due 9/27/2019; Sports Fans Coalition NY, Inc. answer due 9/27/2019.) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/27/2019) (rro)
August 27, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Mark S. Puzella to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number ANYSDC-17498944. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David R. Goodfriend, Sports Fans Coalition NY, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Puzella in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Puzella, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Sheryl Koval Garko to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17498436. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David R. Goodfriend, Sports Fans Coalition NY, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sheryl Garko in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Garko, Sheryl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, Fox Televisions Stations, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Television LLC. (Hentoff, Thomas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sports Fans Coalition NY, Inc..(Hosp, R.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. All Defendants. Service was accepted by R. David Hosp, Counsel for Defendants. Document filed by Fox Televisions Stations, LLC, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, Universal Television LLC, Disney Enterprises, Inc, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, CBS Studios Inc.. (Hentoff, Thomas)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Ronnie Abrams is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Eilleene Brenckman on behalf of David R. Goodfriend, Sports Fans Coalition NY, Inc.. (Brenckman, Elizabeth)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by R. David Hosp on behalf of David R. Goodfriend, Sports Fans Coalition NY, Inc.. (Hosp, R.)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Erin E. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Paul D. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
August 8, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Erin E. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17396013. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Erin E. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17396013. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, Fox Televisions Stations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Murphy, Erin)
August 8, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Paul D. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17395830. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Paul D. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17395830. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, Fox Televisions Stations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Clement, Paul)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/7/2019) (rj)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Thomas G. Hentoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Joseph Marshall Terry, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sports Fans Coalition NY, Inc.. (pc)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David R. Goodfriend. (pc)
August 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 31, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Thomas G. Hentoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17347582. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Thomas G. Hentoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17347582. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, Fox Televisions Stations, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Television LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit PA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hentoff, Thomas)
July 31, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Joseph Marshall Terry, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17345171. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Joseph Marshall Terry, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17345171. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, Fox Televisions Stations, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Television LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit D.C. Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Terry, Joseph)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zweifach, Gerson)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent FOX Corporation for Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, Fox Televisions Stations, LLC; Corporate Parent CBS Corporation for CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc.; Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, Universal Television LLC; Corporate Parent Walt Disney Company for American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, Fox Televisions Stations, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Television LLC.(Zweifach, Gerson)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sports Fans Coalition NY, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, Fox Televisions Stations, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Television LLC. (Zweifach, Gerson)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David R. Goodfriend, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc, Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, Fox Televisions Stations, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Television LLC. (Zweifach, Gerson)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zweifach, Gerson)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David R. Goodfriend, Sports Fans Coalition NY, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17344059)Document filed by Fox Televisions Stations, LLC, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, Universal Television LLC, Disney Enterprises, Inc, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., Open 4 Business Productions, LLC, CBS Studios Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Zweifach, Gerson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. et al v. Goodfriend et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBS Broadcasting Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. Hentoff
Represented By: Gerson Avery Zweifach
Represented By: Joseph M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Hentoff
Represented By: Gerson Avery Zweifach
Represented By: Joseph M. Terry
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Erin E. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox Televisions Stations, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Hentoff
Represented By: Gerson Avery Zweifach
Represented By: Joseph M. Terry
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Erin E. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disney Enterprises, Inc
Represented By: Thomas G. Hentoff
Represented By: Gerson Avery Zweifach
Represented By: Joseph M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Hentoff
Represented By: Gerson Avery Zweifach
Represented By: Joseph M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Open 4 Business Productions, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Hentoff
Represented By: Gerson Avery Zweifach
Represented By: Joseph M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation
Represented By: Thomas G. Hentoff
Represented By: Gerson Avery Zweifach
Represented By: Joseph M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Television LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Hentoff
Represented By: Gerson Avery Zweifach
Represented By: Joseph M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBS Studios Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. Hentoff
Represented By: Gerson Avery Zweifach
Represented By: Joseph M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. Hentoff
Represented By: Gerson Avery Zweifach
Represented By: Joseph M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Goodfriend
Represented By: Mark S. Puzella
Represented By: R. David Hosp
Represented By: Alexander Paul Okuliar
Represented By: Sheryl Koval Garko
Represented By: Elizabeth Eilleene Brenckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sports Fans Coalition NY, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Puzella
Represented By: R. David Hosp
Represented By: Alexander Paul Okuliar
Represented By: Sheryl Koval Garko
Represented By: Elizabeth Eilleene Brenckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?