Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv07149
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE granting #8 Motion for for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference. FIND, ORDER AND ADJUDGE: Plaintiff established that "good cause" exists for it to serve a third party subpoena on Spectrum (hereinafter the "ISP") as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/12/2019) (rj)
August 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Cases. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 10, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Tobias Fieser in Support re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 10, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Patrick Paige in Support re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 10, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Colette Pelissier in Support re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 10, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference . . Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference . Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/9/2019) (kv)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena on Defendant's ISP addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Kevin T. Conway, Esq. dated August 7, 2019. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC.(Conway, Kevin)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc)
August 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kevin T. Conway. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John Doe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC.(Conway, Kevin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Conway, Kevin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Conway, Kevin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17346273)Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Conway, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Kevin T. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?