Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv07186
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 9/19/2019 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (km)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) John Doe. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Conway, Kevin)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The Honorable Alvin K. Hellerstein, U.S.D.J. has ordered that counsel for all parties and any pro se parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of Case Management and scheduling pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Counsel or pro se plaintiff receiving this notice is directed to furnish all attorneys and any pro se parties in this action, as and when they appear, with copies of this order and enclosures, and to retain due proof thereof. If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you must forthwith send a copy of this notice and enclosures to that party personally, informing the party that any unrepresented party is required to appear at the conference in person. Counsel attending the conference should be the attorneys who will try the action, or who have full authority to resolve all issues to be decided, to enter into stipulations and who are authorized to discuss settlement. DATE, PLACE AND TIME OF CONFERENCE: October 25, 2019 at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007, in Courtroom 14D at 10:00 a.m. It is Ordered that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. Please include telephone numbers and fax numbers on all documents submitted to the Court. (Initial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/17/19) (yv)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE denying #6 Motion for for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena. For the reasons set forth in Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, No. 15 Civ. 4369 (AKH), 2015 WL 4092417 (S.D.N.Y. July 6, 2015), Plaintiff fails to show good cause, and its motion for leave to file a third party subpoena on Verizon Internet Services is denied. The case will proceed in normal fashion. The Clerk shall mark the motion (ECF No. 6) terminated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/13/19) (yv)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Cases. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Tobias Fieser in Support re: #6 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Patrick Paige in Support re: #6 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Colette Pelissier in Support re: #6 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference . . Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference . Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC.(Conway, Kevin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Conway, Kevin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Conway, Kevin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17351117)Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Conway, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Kevin T. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?