JM Smith Corporation v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P et al
Plaintiff: JM Smith Corporation
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Astrazeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca L P and PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07233
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Hennings, Kimberly)
September 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #59 MOTION for Colette Tyrrell Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17632329. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 59 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Colette Tyrrell Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17632329. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff. in support of Pro Hac, #2 Exhibit DC Certificate Good Standing, #3 Exhibit VA Certificate Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Connor, Colette) Modified on 9/20/2019 (wb).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #56 Motion for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/28/2019) (mml)
August 27, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #56 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17494569. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #55 Motion for Peter R. Kohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/27/2019) (mml)
August 26, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17494569. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit PHV Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order PHV Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit California Cert. of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit District of Columbia Cert. of Good Standing)(Schmidtlein, John)
August 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #55 MOTION for Peter R. Kohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 26, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Peter R. Kohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohn, Peter)
August 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #52 MOTION for Peter R. Kohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17491082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Pennsylvania. We do not except them from a state bar association.; missing Proposed Order; Attorney Affidavit/Declaration is missing per local rule 1.3;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
August 26, 2019 Filing 54 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. Related Document Number: #52 . (Kohn, Peter) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 8/26/2019 (bcu).
August 26, 2019 Filing 53 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Peter R. Kohn in Support re: #52 MOTION for Peter R. Kohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17491082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kohn, Peter) Modified on 8/26/2019 (bcu).
August 26, 2019 Filing 52 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Peter R. Kohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17491082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation.(Kohn, Peter) Modified on 8/26/2019 (bcu).
August 23, 2019 Filing 51 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Williamson, Brett)
August 23, 2019 Filing 50 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Handa Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Marino, Christopher)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER: ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT: 1. Subject to the Court's entry of this Stipulation, each undersigned counsel agrees, on behalf of the below-identified defendant that they represent (collectively, the "Signatory Defendants"), to accept service of the Complaint to the extent that such service has not previously been accomplished. Except as to service of process, Signatory Defendants expressly reserve the right to challenge the Complaint on any-and-all grounds, including personal jurisdiction. 2. The time for Signatory Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended until October 11, 2019. 3. Signatory Defendants reserve all rights to seek a stay of discovery pending resolution of any dispositive motions directed at the Complaint. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to oppose any such stay of discovery. 4. This Stipulation is entered into without prejudice to any party seeking any interim relief. AstraZeneca L P answer due 10/11/2019; AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P answer due 10/11/2019; Astrazeneca UK Limited answer due 10/11/2019; Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC answer due 10/11/2019; PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc. answer due 10/11/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/23/2019) (mml)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #40 Motion for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/23/2019) (rro)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #41 Motion for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/23/2019) (cf)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #42 Motion for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/23/2019) (cf)
August 22, 2019 Filing 45 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 44 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Astrazeneca PLC for AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited. Document filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited.(Greenblum, Benjamin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin M. Greenblum on behalf of AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
August 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #42 MOTION for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17474111. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17474111. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison B. Smith, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Virginia, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Allison)
August 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17473918. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #40 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17473617. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17473918. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen J. McIntyre, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntyre, Stephen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17473617. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin G. Bradshaw, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradshaw, Benjamin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher John Marino on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Marino, Christopher)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #31 Motion for Jason A. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/21/2019) (ama)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #34 Motion for Craig P. Seebald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/21/2019) (ama)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #30 Motion for Caitlin G. Coslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/21/2019) (ama)
August 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #34 MOTION for Craig P. Seebald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17459119. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 20, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Seebald on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Seebald, Craig)
August 20, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Craig P. Seebald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17459119. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Craig P. Seebald in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - D.C., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Seebald, Craig)
August 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Caitlin G. Coslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17451669. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #31 MOTION for Jason A. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17454546. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laurel Sage Fensterstock on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Fensterstock, Laurel)
August 19, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Alan Levine on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Levine, Jason)
August 19, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Jason A. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17454546. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - New York, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - D.C., #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Levine, Jason)
August 19, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Caitlin G. Coslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17451669. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Coslett, Caitlin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of (Amended Notice of Appearance) re: #28 Notice of Appearance. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Wall, Carolyn)
August 16, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Suzanne Wall on behalf of PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Wall, Carolyn)
August 16, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jay Frackman on behalf of PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Johnston Williamson on behalf of PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Williamson, Brett)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #23 Motion for David Francis Sorensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/16/2019) (mml)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby, ORDERED as follows: 1. Counsel receiving this order shall contact all counsel of record or where a party is not yet represented, such party) and, if necessary, provide them with a copy of this order. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must appear for a conference on 11/8/2019 in courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York I 0007 at 10:00 a.m. (as further set forth in this Order). SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/15/2019) (kv)
August 15, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for David Francis Sorensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17436037. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 15, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for David Francis Sorensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17436037. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorensen, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Service was accepted by C.J. Mou, Authorized Agent. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly)
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc. served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service was accepted by Mary Jean Celestino, Receptionist. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. AstraZeneca L P served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly)
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Opper on behalf of JM Smith Corporation. (Opper, Joseph)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dan Litvin on behalf of JM Smith Corporation. (Litvin, Dan)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aakruti Govind Vakharia on behalf of JM Smith Corporation. (Vakharia, Aakruti)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce E. Gerstein on behalf of JM Smith Corporation. (Gerstein, Bruce)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Marion Hennings on behalf of JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (sj)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (sj)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca UK Limited. (sj)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P. (sj)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AstraZeneca L P. (sj)
August 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
August 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kimberly Marion Hennings. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
August 5, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17361819, paid on 8/2/2019. (sj)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Par Pharmaceutical Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca UK Limited, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca LP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation.(Hennings, Kimberly)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hennings, Kimberly)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation.(Hennings, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JM Smith Corporation v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Laurel Sage Fensterstock
Represented By: Christopher John Marino
Represented By: Craig Seebald
Represented By: Jason Alan Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca UK Limited
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Colette Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Colette Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca L P
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Colette Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn Suzanne Wall
Represented By: Allison Smith
Represented By: Brett Johnston Williamson
Represented By: Stephen McIntyre
Represented By: Andrew Jay Frackman
Represented By: Benjamin Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM Smith Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly Marion Hennings
Represented By: Dan Litvin
Represented By: Joseph Opper
Represented By: David Francis Sorensen
Represented By: Peter Russell Kohn
Represented By: Caitlin G. Coslett
Represented By: Aakruti Govind Vakharia
Represented By: Bruce E. Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?