Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Wesco Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Wesco Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07243
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201dj
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Document filed by Wesco Insurance Co..(Gershweir, Max)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wesco Insurance Co..(Gershweir, Max)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED between Plaintiff and Defendant Wesco Insurance Company("Wesco"), that Wesco's time to answer the Declaratory Judgment Complaint or otherwise appear in the above-captioned matter is extended to October 7, 2019. Defendant's request for an extension of time to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Wesco Insurance Co. answer due 10/7/2019.) Motions terminated: #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation Extending Time To Answer addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Max Gershweir dated 9/4/2019 filed by Wesco Insurance Co. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 9/9/2019) (rro)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation Extending Time To Answer addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Max Gershweir dated 9/4/2019. Document filed by Wesco Insurance Co..(Gershweir, Max)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Wesco Insurance Co. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. Service was accepted by Patricia Nelson. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Dauerty, Guy)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Max W. Gershweir on behalf of Wesco Insurance Co.. (Gershweir, Max)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wesco Insurance Co.. (dnh)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher T. Bradley. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $545,452,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
August 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
August 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher T. Bradley. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (dnh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Guy Philip Dauerty on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Dauerty, Guy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wesco Insurance Co., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Bradley, Christopher)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holding Corporation for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Bradley, Christopher)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bradley, Christopher)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wesco Insurance Co.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17364366)Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Bradley, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Wesco Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher T. Bradley
Represented By: Guy Philip Dauerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesco Insurance Co.
Represented By: Max W. Gershweir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?