Goutakolis v. Madison Global, LLC et al
Plaintiff: George N. Goutakolis
Defendant: Thomas Makkos, Madison Global, LLC d/b/a Nello and Madison Global, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv07260
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Madison Global, LLC, Thomas Makkos.(Hoffmann, Andrew)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Sal Hoffmann on behalf of Madison Global, LLC, Thomas Makkos. (Hoffmann, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Madison Global, LLC served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. Service was accepted by NANCY DOUGHERTY, LEGAL CLERK. Document filed by George N. Goutakolis. (Phillips, William)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Thomas Makkos served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. Service was accepted by "John Smith" Co- worker person spoken to refused to state true first and/or last names. Document filed by George N. Goutakolis. (Phillips, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erica Sanders on behalf of George N. Goutakolis. (Sanders, Erica)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/15/2019) (ks)
August 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so redesignated. (wb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Madison Global, LLC, Thomas Makkos. (pc)
August 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Madison Global, LLC d/b/a Nello. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Madison Global, LLC d/b/a Nello. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MADISON GLOBAL, LLC, d/b/a NELLO, and THOMAS MAKKOS, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by George N. Goutakolis. (Filippatos, Parisis)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Filippatos, Parisis)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Madison Global, LLC d/b/a Nello, Thomas Makkos. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17366031)Document filed by George N. Goutakolis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Filippatos, Parisis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goutakolis v. Madison Global, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Makkos
Represented By: Andrew Sal Hoffmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Global, LLC d/b/a Nello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Global, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Sal Hoffmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George N. Goutakolis
Represented By: Parisis G. Filippatos
Represented By: Erica Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?