Whyte v. AP Housingkeeping, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Alec Whyte
Defendant: AP Housekeeping, Inc. d/b/a "Labor Solutions", VRN Services, Corp. d/b/a "Labor Solutions", VRN Services, Corp. and AP Housekeeping, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07306
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981a
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Sakin on behalf of AP Housekeeping, Inc., VRN Services, Corp.. (Sakin, Alexander)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The Honorable Alvin K. Hellerstein, U.S.D.J. has ordered that counsel for all parties and any pro se parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of Case Management and scheduling pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Counsel or pro se plaintiff receiving this notice is directed to furnish all attorneys and any pro se parties in this action, as and when they appear, with copies of this order and enclosures, and to retain due proof thereof. If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you must forthwith send a copy of this notice and enclosures to that party personally, informing the party that any unrepresented party is required to appear at the conference in person. Counsel attending the conference should be the attorneys who will try the action, or who have full authority to resolve all issues to be decided, to enter into stipulations and who are authorized to discuss settlement. DATE, PLACE AND TIME OF CONFERENCE: October 25, 2019 at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007, in Courtroom 14D at 10:00 a.m. It is Ordered that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. Please include telephone numbers and fax numbers on all documents submitted to the Court. (Initial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/17/19) (yv)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. AP Housekeeping, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; VRN Services, Corp. waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Document filed by Alec Whyte. (Jones, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell M Medina on behalf of Alec Whyte. (Medina, Mitchell)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against AP Housekeeping, Inc., VRN Services, Corp.. Document filed by Alec Whyte.(Jones, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Dean Jones. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $300,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $300,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
August 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Dean Jones to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
August 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Dean Jones. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: AP Housekeeping, Inc. d/b/a "Labor Solutions", VRN Services, Corp. d/b/a "Labor Solutions". The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jones, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AP Housekeeping, Inc. d/b/a "Labor Solutions", VRN Services, Corp. d/b/a "Labor Solutions". (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17377367)Document filed by Alec Whyte.(Jones, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whyte v. AP Housingkeeping, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AP Housekeeping, Inc. d/b/a "Labor Solutions"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VRN Services, Corp. d/b/a "Labor Solutions"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VRN Services, Corp.
Represented By: Alexander Sakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AP Housekeeping, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Sakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alec Whyte
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Jones
Represented By: Mitchell M Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?