United States of America v. $57,162 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $57,162 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2019cv07323
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Juliana Newcomb Murray. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States of America; $57,162 in United States Currency. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
August 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Juliana Newcomb Murray. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code pd (paid);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (jgo)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $57,162 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY.Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Murray, Juliana)
August 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Juliana Newcomb Murray to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint for Forfeiture. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the party role on the PDF case caption must list 'Plaintiff v. Defendant'. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint for Forfeiture found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/12/2019. (jgo)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Murray, Juliana)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $57,162 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY.Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Murray, Juliana) Modified on 8/7/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $57,162 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $57,162 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Juliana Newcomb Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?