Martinez v. McCarthy, Acting Secretary, Department of the Army et al
Plaintiff: Darlene Martinez
Defendant: Jonathan Weisbrod, Charles Michels, Ryan McCarthy, Acting Secretary, Department of the Army and Acting Secretary Ryan McCarthy
Case Number: 1:2019cv07333
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Bannon on behalf of Ryan McCarthy. (Bannon, Zachary)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Charles Michels served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. Service was accepted by Charles Michels. Document filed by Darlene Martinez. (Ma, Tiffany)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served. Ryan McCarthy served on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service was accepted by Ostick Gordon. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Darlene Martinez. (Ma, Tiffany)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Jonathan Weisbrod served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. Service was accepted by Jonathan Weisbrod. Document filed by Darlene Martinez. (Ma, Tiffany)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been designated an electronic case and has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. An Initial pretrial conference will be held on Wednesday, December 18, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. at the United States District Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, Courtroom 11A. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/7/2019) (kv)
August 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tiffany Ma. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ryan McCarthy. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (pne)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryan McCarthy. (pne)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jonathan Weisbrod. (pne)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Charles Michels. (pne)
August 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan Weisbrod, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Darlene Martinez. (Ma, Tiffany)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Charles Michels, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Darlene Martinez. (Ma, Tiffany)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan McCarthy, Acting Secretary, Department of the Army, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Darlene Martinez. (Ma, Tiffany)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ma, Tiffany)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan McCarthy, Acting Secretary, Department of the Army, Charles Michels, Jonathan Weisbrod. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17382017)Document filed by Darlene Martinez.(Ma, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. McCarthy, Acting Secretary, Department of the Army et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Weisbrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Michels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan McCarthy, Acting Secretary, Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Ryan McCarthy
Represented By: Zachary Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Martinez
Represented By: Tiffany Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?