Wolfle v. Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Christopher Wolfle
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv07382
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Steven R. Kramer, Esq. dated 10/4/2019 re: requesting adjournment of October 15, 2019 case management conference, with consent of plaintiff's counsel. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company.(Kramer, Steven)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Robert Kramer on behalf of Long Island Railroad Company. (Kramer, Steven)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Long Island Railroad Company waiver sent on 8/27/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. Document filed by Christopher Wolfle. (Wietzke, Marc)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: granting #7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 7, 2019 is adjourned to October 15, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. The joint status letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's August 29, 2019 order are due no later than October 8, 2019. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/06/2019) (ama)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Marc Wietzke dated September 4, 2019. Document filed by Christopher Wolfle.(Wietzke, Marc)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: September 30, 2019. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: October 7, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/29/2019) (ama)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Island Railroad Company. (pne)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Wolfle. (Wietzke, Marc) Modified on 8/20/2019 (dnh). Modified on 8/27/2019 (pne).
August 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Marc Twyman Wietzke to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'C/o' Error; Include 'c/o' or 'via' before second party names (via Jamaica Station). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
August 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wietzke, Marc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Wolfle. (Wietzke, Marc) Modified on 8/8/2019 (dnh).
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17390296)Document filed by Christopher Wolfle.(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfle v. Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: Steven Robert Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wolfle
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?