Antolini v. N Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dino Antolinu and Dino Antolini
Defendant: Shiyang Hui, Nicholas J. Pritzker, N Corporation, TIPSY SHANGHAI RESTAURANT MANAGEMENT INC. and Nicholas S. Pritzker
Case Number: 1:2019cv07385
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #20 Letter filed by Dino Antolini. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter, claiming that Defendants are inhibiting him from complying with the Court's August 28, 2019 Order concerning the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for November 5, 2019 (Dkt. #14), and Defendants' reply letter, which does not materially address the issues raised in Plaintiff's letter. (Dkt. #21). The parties are reminded that they must comply with the Court's August 28, 2019 Order. (Dkt. #14). Plaintiff is further reminded that more than a month remains before the initial pretrial conference is scheduled to occur, and the time to engage in discovery has not yet begun, and will not begin until after the initial pretrial conference. The Court will address any disputes that remain between the parties concerning compliance with their Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) obligations at the initial pretrial conference. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/1/2019) (rro)
September 30, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE . Document filed by Shiyang Hui, N Corporation, Tipsy Shanghai Restaurant Management Inc.. (He, Yinghui)
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Stuart H. Finkelstein dated 9-25-19 re: Court order. Document filed by Dino Antolini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Finkelstein, Stuart)
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #16 Letter filed by Dino Antolini. ENDORSEMENT: The Court refers Plaintiff to Attachment A of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which provides the procedure for filing a motion for default judgment. There is no requirement of a pre-motion conference in this setting. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/12/2019) (rro)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. Document filed by Dino Antolini. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #10 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Shiyang Hui, N Corporation, Tipsy Shanghai Restaurant Management Inc..(He, Yinghui)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Stuart H. Finkelstein dated 9-12-19 re: Motion. Document filed by Dino Antolini.(Finkelstein, Stuart)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yinghui He on behalf of Shiyang Hui, N Corporation, Tipsy Shanghai Restaurant Management Inc.. (He, Yinghui)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/28/2019) (ks)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Shiyang Hui served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019; N Corporation served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019; Nicholas S. Pritzker served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019; Tipsy Shanghai Restaurant Management Inc. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. Service was accepted by Kathy W, JJimmy "Doe". Document filed by Dino Antolini. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nicholas S. Pritzker. (dnh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nicholas Pritzker, re: #10 Complaint. Document filed by Dino Antolini. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Shiyang Hui, N Corporation, Nicholas S. Pritzker, Tipsy Shanghai Restaurant Management Inc.. Document filed by Dino Antolini.(Finkelstein, Stuart)
August 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Stuart H. Finkelstein to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tipsy Shanghai Restaurant Management Inc.. (sj)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shiyang Hui. (sj)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to N Corporation. (sj)
August 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
August 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
August 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stuart H. Finkelstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to New York. (sj)
August 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Stuart H. Finkelstein to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
August 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stuart H. Finkelstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Dino Antolini; Nicholas S. Pritzker; Tipsy Shanghai Restaurant Management Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tipsy Shanghai Restaurant Management Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dino Antolinu. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shiyang Hui, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dino Antolinu. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Nicholas Pritzker, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dino Antolinu., REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nicholas Pritzker, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dino Antolinu. (Finkelstein, Stuart) Modified on 8/8/2019 (sj).
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to N Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dino Antolinu. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Shiyang Hui, N Corporation, Nicholas J. Pritzker, TIPSY SHANGHAI RESTAURANT MANAGEMENT INC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-17390829)Document filed by Dino Antolinu.(Finkelstein, Stuart) Modified on 8/8/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antolini v. N Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiyang Hui
Represented By: Yinghui He
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas J. Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Corporation
Represented By: Yinghui He
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIPSY SHANGHAI RESTAURANT MANAGEMENT INC.
Represented By: Yinghui He
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas S. Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dino Antolinu
Represented By: Stuart H. Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dino Antolini
Represented By: Stuart H. Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?