Sweeney v. BDO USA, LLP et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Sweeney
Defendant: BDO USA, LLP and Janet Bernier
Case Number: 1:2019cv07389
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: October 14, 2019. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: October 21, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/10/2019) (ama)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. BDO USA, LLP waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Janet Bernier(in her professional capacities) waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Janet Bernier(in her individual capacities) waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. Document filed by Dennis Sweeney. (Rahman, Tanvir)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Janet Bernier(in her professional capacities), Janet Bernier(in her individual capacities). (sj)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BDO USA, LLP. (sj)
August 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
August 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tanvir Haque Rahman on behalf of Dennis Sweeney. (Rahman, Tanvir)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Janet Bernier, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dennis Sweeney. (Gottlieb, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BDO USA, LLP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dennis Sweeney. (Gottlieb, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gottlieb, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BDO USA, LLP, Janet Bernier(in her professional capacities), Janet Bernier(in her individual capacities). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17391226)Document filed by Dennis Sweeney.(Gottlieb, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweeney v. BDO USA, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Sweeney
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Tanvir Haque Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDO USA, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?