Perez et al v. Mexican Hospitality Operator LLC et al
Plaintiff: Juan Perez, Daniele Flumiani, Ana Dorantes, Fabio Reyes, Jesus Nava, Angel Tepole, Adrian Hernandez, Elizabeth Castelan, Sergio Ramirez, Wuilber Garcia, Eulises Cortez, Francisco Garcia, Agustin Diaz, Giovanni Hernandez and Cesar Mendoza
Defendant: Enrique Olvera, Cosme NY LLC, Daniela Soto-Innes and Mexican Hospitality Operator LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv07403
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Cosme NY LLC waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019; Mexican Hospitality Operator LLC waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019; Enrique Olvera waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019; Daniela Soto-Innes waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. Document filed by Agustin Diaz; Angel Tepole; Wuilber Garcia; Ana Dorantes; Juan Perez; Giovanni Hernandez; Sergio Ramirez; Francisco Garcia; Elizabeth Castelan; Fabio Reyes; Eulises Cortez; Daniele Flumiani; Cesar Mendoza; Adrian Hernandez; Jesus Nava. (Slotnick, Gregory)
September 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
September 11, 2019 Filing 30 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Agustin Diaz.(Slotnick, Gregory)
September 3, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David John Grech on behalf of Cosme NY LLC, Mexican Hospitality Operator LLC, Enrique Olvera, Daniela Soto-Innes. (Grech, David)
September 3, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alex David Dumas on behalf of Cosme NY LLC, Mexican Hospitality Operator LLC, Enrique Olvera, Daniela Soto-Innes. (Dumas, Alex)
August 26, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Alan Miller on behalf of Cosme NY LLC, Mexican Hospitality Operator LLC, Enrique Olvera, Daniela Soto-Innes. (Miller, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Wilde Leonard on behalf of Cosme NY LLC, Mexican Hospitality Operator LLC, Enrique Olvera, Daniela Soto-Innes. (Leonard, Alexander)
August 23, 2019 Filing 25 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jesus Nava.(Slotnick, Gregory)
August 21, 2019 Filing 24 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Sergio Ramirez.(Slotnick, Gregory)
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Francisco Garcia.(Slotnick, Gregory)
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Cesar Mendoza.(Slotnick, Gregory)
August 21, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Giovanni Hernandez.(Slotnick, Gregory)
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Elizabeth Castelan.(Slotnick, Gregory)
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Angel Tepole.(Slotnick, Gregory)
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Fabio Reyes.(Slotnick, Gregory)
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Adrian Hernandez.(Slotnick, Gregory)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Ana Dorantes.(Slotnick, Gregory)
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Juan Perez.(Slotnick, Gregory)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Daniele Flumiani.(Slotnick, Gregory)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Wuilber Garcia.(Slotnick, Gregory)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Eulises Cortez.(Slotnick, Gregory)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Enrique Olvera. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mexican Hospitality Operator LLC. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniela Soto-Innes. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cosme NY LLC. (pc)
August 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Louis Pechman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Fabio Reyes, Daniele Flumiani, Angel Tepole, Ana Dorantes, Adrian Hernandez, Juan Perez, Jesus Nava. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory S Slotnick on behalf of Ana Dorantes, Daniele Flumiani, Adrian Hernandez, Jesus Nava, Juan Perez, Fabio Reyes, Angel Tepole. (Slotnick, Gregory)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daniela Soto-Innes, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ana Dorantes, Daniele Flumiani, Adrian Hernandez, Jesus Nava, Juan Perez, Fabio Reyes, Angel Tepole. (Pechman, Louis)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Enrique Olvera, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ana Dorantes, Daniele Flumiani, Adrian Hernandez, Jesus Nava, Juan Perez, Fabio Reyes, Angel Tepole. (Pechman, Louis)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cosme NY LLC d/b/a Cosme, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ana Dorantes, Daniele Flumiani, Adrian Hernandez, Jesus Nava, Juan Perez, Fabio Reyes, Angel Tepole. (Pechman, Louis)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mexican Hospitality Operator LLC d/b/a Cosme, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ana Dorantes, Daniele Flumiani, Adrian Hernandez, Jesus Nava, Juan Perez, Fabio Reyes, Angel Tepole. (Pechman, Louis)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pechman, Louis)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cosme NY LLC, Mexican Hospitality Operator LLC, Enrique Olvera, Daniela Soto-Innes. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17393841)Document filed by Fabio Reyes, Daniele Flumiani, Angel Tepole, Ana Dorantes, Adrian Hernandez, Juan Perez, Jesus Nava.(Pechman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. Mexican Hospitality Operator LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Olvera
Represented By: Alexander Wilde Leonard
Represented By: David John Grech
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Alex David Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosme NY LLC
Represented By: Alexander Wilde Leonard
Represented By: David John Grech
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Alex David Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniela Soto-Innes
Represented By: Alexander Wilde Leonard
Represented By: David John Grech
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Alex David Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mexican Hospitality Operator LLC
Represented By: Alexander Wilde Leonard
Represented By: David John Grech
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Alex David Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Perez
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniele Flumiani
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Dorantes
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabio Reyes
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Nava
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Tepole
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Hernandez
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Castelan
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Ramirez
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wuilber Garcia
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eulises Cortez
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Garcia
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin Diaz
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanni Hernandez
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Mendoza
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?