Cimino et al v. Headway Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Basecamp Inc. and Anthony Cimino
Defendant: NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd., TDK Corporation, NHK International Corp., NHK Spring Co., Ltd., SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd., Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., Hutchinson Technology Inc., NHK Spring Precision (Guangzhou) Co., Ltd., NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd., Headway Technologies, Inc., NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd. and NHK International Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv07428
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, December 6, 2019 at 3:00pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. In accordance with the Court's Individual Rules, the parties are hereby ORDERED to ECF file a Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order no later than seven days prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order available at the Court's website (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Nathan). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that included with the Proposed Civil Case Management Plan, the parties jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. (Initial Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/29/19) (yv)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Cari Campen Laufenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (Nathan, Alison) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Raymond John Farrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (Nathan, Alison) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
August 23, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #26 MOTION for Cari Campen Laufenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17478536. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 22, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Cari Campen Laufenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17478536. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Basecamp Inc., Anthony Cimino. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Laufenberg, Cari)
August 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Raymond John Farrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17471143. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Raymond John Farrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17471143. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Basecamp Inc., Anthony Cimino. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Of Raymond J. Farrow In Support of Motion)(Farrow, Raymond)
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TDK Corporation. (sj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd.. (sj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NHK Spring Precision (Guangzhou) Co., Ltd.. (sj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NHK Spring Co., Ltd.. (sj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd.. (sj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NHK International Corporation. (sj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd.. (sj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd.. (sj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd.. (sj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hutchinson Technology Inc.. (sj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Headway Technologies, Inc.. (sj)
August 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
August 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
August 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney George Fuad Farah. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Class Action code n (No Class Action Alleged). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Class Action code has been modified to y (Class Action Alleged). (sj)
August 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney George Fuad Farah. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NHK International Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TDK CORPORATION, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Basecamp Inc., Anthony Cimino. (Farah, George)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SAE MAGNETICS (H.K.) LTD., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Basecamp Inc., Anthony Cimino. (Farah, George)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NHK SPRING PRECISION (GUANGZHOU) CO., LTD., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Basecamp Inc., Anthony Cimino. (Farah, George)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NHK SPRING CO. LTD., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Basecamp Inc., Anthony Cimino. (Farah, George)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NHK SPRING (THAILAND) CO., LTD., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Basecamp Inc., Anthony Cimino. (Farah, George)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NHK INTERNATIONAL CORP., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Basecamp Inc., Anthony Cimino. (Farah, George)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NAT PERIPHERAL (H.K.) CO., LTD., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Basecamp Inc., Anthony Cimino. (Farah, George)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NAT PERIPHERAL (DONG GUAN) CO., LTD., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Basecamp Inc., Anthony Cimino. (Farah, George)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MAGNECOMP PRECISION TECHNOLOGY PUBLIC CO. LTD., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Basecamp Inc., Anthony Cimino. (Farah, George)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hutchinson Technology, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Basecamp Inc., Anthony Cimino. (Farah, George)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Headway Technologies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Basecamp Inc., Anthony Cimino. (Farah, George)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Farah, George)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Headway Technologies, Inc., Hutchinson Technology Inc., Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd., NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd., NHK International Corp., NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd., NHK Spring Co., Ltd., NHK Spring Precision (Guangzhou) Co., Ltd., SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd., TDK Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17397511)Document filed by Anthony Cimino, Basecamp Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Farah, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cimino et al v. Headway Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDK Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK International Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutchinson Technology Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring Precision (Guangzhou) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Headway Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basecamp Inc.
Represented By: George Fuad Farah
Represented By: Cari Campen Laufenberg
Represented By: Raymond J. Farrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cimino
Represented By: George Fuad Farah
Represented By: Cari Campen Laufenberg
Represented By: Raymond J. Farrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?