The Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York v. Encyclopaedia Iranica Foundation
Plaintiff: The Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York and Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York
Defendant: Encyclopaedia Iranica Foundation
Case Number: 1:2019cv07465
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part [25 in 19cv8562] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. By October 21, 2019, Brill shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/7/2019) (cf)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Michael Abbott Grow to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (JT)
September 30, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Michael A. Grow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17688093. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Michael A. Grow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17688093. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Encyclopaedia Iranica Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael A. Grow, #2 Exhibit of the Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Grow, Michael)
September 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Encyclopaedia Iranica Foundation answer due 10/21/2019. (mro)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. By October 21, 2019, the Foundation shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in No. 19 Civ. 7465. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/27/2019) (mro)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until October 30, 2019 addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Marylee Jenkins, Esq. dated September 27, 2019. Document filed by Encyclopaedia Iranica Foundation.(Jenkins, Marylee)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jocelyn Lee Jacobson on behalf of Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Jacobson, Jocelyn)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Alan Yearwood on behalf of Encyclopaedia Iranica Foundation. (Yearwood, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Scarpati on behalf of Encyclopaedia Iranica Foundation. (Scarpati, Michael)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marylee Jenkins on behalf of Encyclopaedia Iranica Foundation. (Jenkins, Marylee)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Robert W. Clarida dated September 24, 2019 re: Service of process. Document filed by Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York.(Clarida, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Encyclopaedia Iranica Foundation served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Document filed by Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Clarida, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/12/2019) (cf)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/12/2019) (cf)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Encyclopaedia Iranica Foundation. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert William Clarida. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 17:201;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:2201;. (pc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Titles and Registration Numbers)(Clarida, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Encyclopaedia Iranica Foundation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by The Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Clarida, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Clarida, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Encyclopaedia Iranica Foundation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17401922)Document filed by The Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York.(Clarida, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York v. Encyclopaedia Iranica Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encyclopaedia Iranica Foundation
Represented By: David Alan Yearwood
Represented By: Michael Scarpati
Represented By: Michael A. Grow
Represented By: Marylee Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York
Represented By: Robert William Clarida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees Of Columbia University in the City of New York
Represented By: Robert William Clarida
Represented By: Jocelyn Lee Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?