C. V. et al v. Azar et al
Petitioner: C. V. and F. V.
Respondent: Kim Chow, Alex M. Azar, II, Linda Hyde, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Jonathan Hildreth Hayes, Susan Quintana, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Kevin K. McAleenan and Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv07486
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, that: 1. This action is dismissed without prejudice and without costs or attorney's fees to either party; 2. The Office of Refugee Resettlement shall take the petitioners to the United States- Canada border and allow them to seek admission into Canada within two weeks of the Court's entry of this Order; 3. The parties acknowledge that whether the petitioners will be admitted into Canada when they are at the United States-Canada border and whether, if the petitioners are admitted into Canada, they will be released to the custody of their mother are issues to be determined by the relevant Canadian authorities; 4. The petitioners acknowledge and agree that, although ORR intends to place them in their current foster care placement if they are not admitted into Canada, there may be unforeseen circumstances that may require the government to place the petitioners with a different long-term foster care family placement or in a shelter. Further, the government may take any lawful action to determine whether petitioners may remain in the United States; and 5. The Office of Refugee Resettlement has agreed to take the petitioners to the United States-Canada border and allow them to seek admission into Canada based on the specific unique facts and circumstances presented in this matter, and nothing in this stipulation shall be construed as a concession of any rights or arguments by the government; nor shall it be construed to require the government to provide similar relief to any other alien in similar or dissimilar circumstances, and this agreement shall in no way be used to undermine the government's litigation position in any other case. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/7/2019) (js)
October 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Status Conference held on 10/7/2019. (bh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated October 4, 2019 re: current draft of proposed Stipulation and Order for discussion at October 7 conference. Document filed by Alex M. Azar, II, Kim Chow, Department of Health and Human Services, Jonathan Hildreth Hayes, Linda Hyde, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Susan Quintana, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit current proposed Stipulation and Order for discussion at October 7 conference)(Byars, Michael)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. ALL DEADLINES AND HEARING DATES ARE ADJOURNED SINE DIE. THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A STATUS CONFERENCE ON MONDAY, OCTOBER 7, 2019 AT 11:00 AM. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference presently scheduled for November 1, 2019 addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated October 2, 2019., CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated October 2, 2019., CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to brief the petition addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated October 2, 2019. Document filed by Alex M. Azar, II, Kim Chow, Department of Health and Human Services, Jonathan Hildreth Hayes, Linda Hyde, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Susan Quintana, U.S. Department of Homeland Security.(Byars, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Alex M. Azar, II answer due 10/4/2019; Kim Chow answer due 10/4/2019; Department of Health and Human Services answer due 10/4/2019; Jonathan Hildreth Hayes answer due 10/4/2019; Linda Hyde answer due 10/4/2019; Immigration and Customs Enforcement answer due 10/4/2019; Kevin K. McAleenan answer due 10/4/2019; Office of Refugee Resettlement answer due 10/4/2019; Susan Quintana answer due 10/4/2019; U.S. Department of Homeland Security answer due 10/4/2019., Set/Reset Hearings:( Status Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (mro)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Granted. The parties shall follow the briefing schedule set forth above. The October 8, 2019 hearing is adjourned to November 1, 2019, at 3:00 pm. Replies due by 10/11/2019. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/10/2019) (mro)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated September 9, 2019. Document filed by Alex M. Azar, II, Kim Chow, Department of Health and Human Services, Jonathan Hildreth Hayes, Linda Hyde, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Susan Quintana, U.S. Department of Homeland Security.(Byars, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Alex M. Azar, II, Kim Chow, Department of Health and Human Services, Jonathan Hildreth Hayes, Linda Hyde, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Susan Quintana, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Byars, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by C. V., F. V.. (Dycus, Jamie)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioners shall serve copies of the petition and this Order on Respondents by August 21, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall submit a written response to the petition no later than September 11, 2019. If Petitioners wish to submit a reply brief, they must do so no later than September 18, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on October 8, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 706 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. At this hearing, Respondents will show cause why the writ should not be issued. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/14/2019) (js)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Russell Spivak on behalf of C. V., F. V. (Spivak, Russell)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Emily Nix on behalf of C. V., F. V. (Nix, Emily)
August 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
August 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Justin Goodyear on behalf of C. V., F. V. (Goodyear, Justin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Jamie S. Dycus in Support re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by C. V., F. V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2018-11-29 IJ Oral Decision, #2 Exhibit B - 2018-11-29 Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - BIA Decision)(Dycus, Jamie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dycus, Jamie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17405316)Document filed by F. V., C. V..(Dycus, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. V. et al v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kim Chow
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda Hyde
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jonathan Hildreth Hayes
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Susan Quintana
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Office of Refugee Resettlement
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: C. V.
Represented By: Jamie Stephen Dycus
Represented By: Justin Goodyear
Represented By: Russell Spivak
Represented By: Emily Nix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: F. V.
Represented By: Jamie Stephen Dycus
Represented By: Justin Goodyear
Represented By: Russell Spivak
Represented By: Emily Nix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?