Saavedra v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Yajaira Saavedra
Defendant: P.O.s John and Jane Doe #1-10 and City Of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv07491
Filed: August 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angharad Wilson on behalf of City Of New York. (Wilson, Angharad)
August 17, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. City Of New York served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck. Document filed by Yajaira Saavedra. (Weber, Rose)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/12/2019) (ks)
August 12, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents City Of New York, John and Jane Doe #1-10, John and Jane Doe #1-10 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Yajaira Saavedra. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Weber, Rose)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (dnh)
August 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
August 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
August 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Rose Minna Weber re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add party 'P.O.s John and Jane Doe #1-10' with party text 'in their official capacities, the names John and Jane Doe being fictitious, as the true names are presently unknown.' Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (dnh)
August 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rose Minna Weber. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The City Of New York, P.O.s John and Jane Doe #1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; Exclude from the entry of business name any leading A, An or The.. (dnh)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr)
August 11, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weber, Rose)
August 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE CITY OF NEW YORK, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yajaira Saavedra. (Weber, Rose)
August 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John and Jane Doe #1-10, The City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17406926)Document filed by Yajaira Saavedra.(Weber, Rose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saavedra v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O.s John and Jane Doe #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: Angharad Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yajaira Saavedra
Represented By: Rose Minna Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?