Securities and Exchange Commission v. Tsai
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commisison and Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Bill Tsai
Case Number: 1:2019cv07501
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 9, 2019 is adjourned to January 8, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The joint status letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's August 29, 2019 order are due no later than January 2, 2020. The parties are directed to submit a joint status letter regarding the status of their settlement efforts by no later than November 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.). (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/1/19) (yv)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and deadlines set forth in the Courts Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Melanie A. MacLean dated September 27, 2019. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(MacLean, Melanie)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Judge Woods Individual Rules served on Bill Tsai on September 12, 2019. Service was accepted by Carolina A. Fornos, Esq. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (MacLean, Melanie)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bill Tsai waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (MacLean, Melanie)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/29/2019) (anc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simona K. Suh on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Suh, Simona)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (MacLean, Melanie)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Melanie Anne MacLean. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Securities and Exchange Commission. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
August 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Melanie Anne MacLean to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (MacLean, Melanie) Modified on 8/13/2019 (jgo).
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bill Tsai. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison.(MacLean, Melanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commisison
Represented By: Melanie Anne MacLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Melanie Anne MacLean
Represented By: Simona K. Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?