Roldan v. Trimasa Restaurant Partners LLC et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Roldan
Defendant: LW Retail Associates LLC, Trimasa Restaurant Partners LLC and Takayama Management LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv07510
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pre-trial conference scheduled for October 22, 2019, is hereby adjourned to October 29, 2019 at 10:40 a.m. No further extension will be granted. The joint proposed civil case management plan, scheduling order and joint letter are due by October 22, 2019, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules. Initial Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/4/2019) (cf)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Donald Weiss dated 10/3/19. Document filed by Barbara Roldan.(Weiss, Donald)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED in part. The initial pre-trial conference scheduled for October 8, 2019, is hereby adjourned to October 22, 2019 at 10:40 a.m. Initial Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/2/2019) (cf)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled for October 8, 2019 addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jason B. Jendrewski, Esq. dated October 1, 2019. Document filed by Takayama Management LLC, Trimasa Restaurant Partners LLC.(Jendrewski, Jason)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Conference Order and Judge's rules served on TRIMASA RESTAURANT PARTNERS LLC & TAKAYAMA MANAGEMENT LLC, collectively d/b/a TETSU and LW RETAIL ASSOCIATES LLC on 9/24/19. Service was made by email. Document filed by Barbara Roldan. (Weiss, Donald)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. LW Retail Associates LLC waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. Document filed by Barbara Roldan. (Weiss, Donald)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Brett Jendrewski on behalf of Takayama Management LLC, Trimasa Restaurant Partners LLC. (Jendrewski, Jason)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Diane Richmond on behalf of Takayama Management LLC, Trimasa Restaurant Partners LLC. (Richmond, Carolyn)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. (as further set forth in this Order). Initial Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/22/2019) (kv) .
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Takayama Management LLC waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Document filed by Barbara Roldan. (Weiss, Donald)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Trimasa Restaurant Partners LLC waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Document filed by Barbara Roldan. (Weiss, Donald)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LW Retail Associates LLC, Takayama Management LLC, Trimasa Restaurant Partners LLC. (jgo)
August 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Donald Jeffrey Weiss. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Takayama Management LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Donald Jeffrey Weiss. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weiss, Donald)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TRIMASA RESTAURANT PARTNERS LLC & TAKAYAMA MANAGEMENT LLC, collectively d/b/a TETSU and LW RETAIL ASSOCIATES LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Roldan. (Weiss, Donald)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LW Retail Associates LLC, Takayama Management LLC, Trimasa Restaurant Partners LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17410064)Document filed by Barbara Roldan.(Weiss, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roldan v. Trimasa Restaurant Partners LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LW Retail Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trimasa Restaurant Partners LLC
Represented By: Jason Brett Jendrewski
Represented By: Carolyn Diane Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takayama Management LLC
Represented By: Jason Brett Jendrewski
Represented By: Carolyn Diane Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Roldan
Represented By: Donald Jeffrey Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?