Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Reyes et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Omara M. Huertas Reyes, Individually, and as officer, director, shareholder, and/or principal of 40-60 Broadway Restaurant, Inc. d/b/a Aqua Marina, Omara M. Huertas Reyes, Individually, 40-60 Broadway Restaurant, Inc. and Omara M. Huertas Reyes
Case Number: 1:2019cv07521
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 40-60 Broadway Restaurant, Inc., Omara M. Huertas Reyes, Omara M. Huertas Reyes.(DeMaio, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. 40-60 Broadway Restaurant, Inc. served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty - Authorized Agent. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Lonstein, Julie)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Julie Cohen Lonstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Julie Cohen Lonstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Omara M. Huertas Reyes, Omara M. Huertas Reyes. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (pne)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pne)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Omara M. Huertas Reyes, Omara M. Huertas Reyes. (pne)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 40-60 Broadway Restaurant, Inc.. (pne)
August 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Lonstein, Julie)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 40-60 Broadway Restaurant, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Lonstein, Julie)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Omara M. Huertas Reyes, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Lonstein, Julie)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc..(Lonstein, Julie)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lonstein, Julie)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 40-60 Broadway Restaurant, Inc., Omara M. Huertas Reyes, Individually, Omara M. Huertas Reyes, Individually, and as officer, director, shareholder, and/or principal of 40-60 Broadway Restaurant, Inc. d/b/a Aqua Marina. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17412201)Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc..(Lonstein, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Reyes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omara M. Huertas Reyes, Individually, and as officer, director, shareholder, and/or principal of 40-60 Broadway Restaurant, Inc. d/b/a Aqua Marina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omara M. Huertas Reyes, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 40-60 Broadway Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By: John P. DeMaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omara M. Huertas Reyes
Represented By: John P. DeMaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?