Monosson et al v. Teekay Offshore Partners L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Whiting and Steven A. Monosson
Defendant: Ian Craig, Kenneth Hvid, Ingvild Saether, Brookfield Business Partners, L.P., Jim Reid, William Utt, Teekay Offshore GP, LLC, Greg Morrison, Craig Laurie, Teekay Offshore Partners L.P., William Transier, Walter Weathers, Denis Turcotte, Cyrus Madon, David Lemmon, Jan Rune Steinsland and Brookfield Asset Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07522
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Thomas L. Laughlin IV dated October 10, 2019. Document filed by Steven A. Monosson, Mark Whiting.(Laughlin, Thomas)
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ingvild Saether served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. Service was accepted by Edith Robinson, Corporate secretary for Teekay. Document filed by Mark Whiting; Steven A. Monosson. (Laughlin, Thomas)
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jan Rune Steinsland served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. Service was accepted by Edith Robinson, Corporate secretary for Teekay. Document filed by Mark Whiting; Steven A. Monosson. (Laughlin, Thomas)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pre-trial conference is adjourned to October 17, 2019 at 12:45 p.m. All pre-conference materials identified in the order at Dkt. 5 shall be due one week prior. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 12:45 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/27/2019) (rj)
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference to October 17, 2019 addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Matthew Solum dated September 26, 2019. Document filed by Brookfield Asset Management, Inc., Brookfield Business Partners, L.P..(Solum, Matthew)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Terence Yuwen Leong on behalf of Brookfield Asset Management, Inc., Brookfield Business Partners, L.P.. (Leong, Terence)
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Osborn Solum on behalf of Brookfield Asset Management, Inc., Brookfield Business Partners, L.P.. (Solum, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 12:15 PM in Courtroom 1506 of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/9/2019) (mro)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Walter Weathers waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. Document filed by Mark Whiting; Steven A. Monosson. (Laughlin, Thomas)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. William Utt waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. Document filed by Mark Whiting; Steven A. Monosson. (Laughlin, Thomas)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. William Transier waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. Document filed by Mark Whiting; Steven A. Monosson. (Laughlin, Thomas)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Teekay Offshore Partners L.P. waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. Document filed by Mark Whiting; Steven A. Monosson. (Laughlin, Thomas)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Teekay Offshore GP, LLC waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. Document filed by Mark Whiting; Steven A. Monosson. (Laughlin, Thomas)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David Lemmon waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. Document filed by Mark Whiting; Steven A. Monosson. (Laughlin, Thomas)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Craig Laurie waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. Document filed by Mark Whiting; Steven A. Monosson. (Laughlin, Thomas)
September 5, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-06483-RA. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
September 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ad)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brookfield Asset Management, Inc., Brookfield Business Partners, L.P., Ian Craig, Kenneth Hvid, Craig Laurie, David Lemmon, Cyrus Madon, Greg Morrison, Jim Reid, Ingvild Saether, Jan Rune Steinsland, Teekay Offshore GP, LLC, Teekay Offshore Partners L.P., William Transier, Denis Turcotte, William Utt, Walter Weathers. (dnh)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teekay Offshore Partners L.P., Teekay Offshore GP L.L.C., Brookfield Asset Management, Inc., Brookfield Business Partners L.P., William Utt, Ian Craig, Kenneth Hvid, Craig Laurie, David Lemmon, Jim Reid, Denis Turcotte, Greg Morrison, William Transier, Walter Weathers, Ingvild Saether, Jan Rune Steinsland, and Cyrus Madon, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Steven A. Monosson, Mark Whiting. (Laughlin, Thomas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jing-Li Yu on behalf of Steven A. Monosson, Mark Whiting. (Yu, Jing-Li)
August 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
August 13, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Ronnie Abrams as possibly related to 19CV6483. (pne)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-6483 (RA). Document filed by Steven A. Monosson, Mark Whiting.(Laughlin, Thomas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Steven A. Monosson, Mark Whiting.(Laughlin, Thomas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Laughlin, Thomas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brookfield Asset Management, Inc., Brookfield Business Partners, L.P., Ian Craig, Kenneth Hvid, Craig Laurie, David Lemmon, Cyrus Madon, Greg Morrison, Jim Reid, Ingvild Saether, Jan Rune Steinsland, Teekay Offshore GP, LLC, Teekay Offshore Partners L.P., William Transier, Denis Turcotte, William Utt, Walter Weathers. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17412594)Document filed by Mark Whiting, Steven A. Monosson.(Laughlin, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monosson et al v. Teekay Offshore Partners L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Hvid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingvild Saether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Business Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Terence Yuwen Leong
Represented By: Matthew Osborn Solum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Utt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teekay Offshore GP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Laurie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teekay Offshore Partners L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Transier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Weathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis Turcotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyrus Madon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lemmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Rune Steinsland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Asset Management, Inc.
Represented By: Terence Yuwen Leong
Represented By: Matthew Osborn Solum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Whiting
Represented By: Thomas Livezey Laughlin, IV
Represented By: Jing-Li Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven A. Monosson
Represented By: Thomas Livezey Laughlin, IV
Represented By: Jing-Li Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?