Alley v. Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Janice Alley
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv07530
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Marc Wietzke dated October 8, 2019 re: Joint Letter and Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Janice Alley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Wietzke, Marc)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: WHEREAS, on August 22, 2019, the Court ordered an initial conference for October 8, 2019 (Dkt. No. 5); WHEREAS, on September 5, 2019, the Court issued an order granting Plaintiff's request to adjourn the initial conference to October 15, 2019 at 10:40 a.m. (Dkt. No. 7); it is hereby ORDERED that, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules, the parties shall submit a joint Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order and a joint letter by October 9, 2019, as explained in the Court's first order setting the initial conference (Dkt. No. 5). (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/8/2019) (mro)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Patrick Constable on behalf of Janice Alley. (Constable, Sean)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company.(Muccigrosso, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges & Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Metro-North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit Authority for Long Island Railroad Company. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company.(Muccigrosso, Andrew)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pre-trial conference currently scheduled for October 8, 2019 at 10:40 a.m., is adjourned to October 15, 2019 at 10:40 a.m. Initial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/5/2019) (cf)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Time addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Marc Wietzke dated September 4, 2019. Document filed by Janice Alley.(Wietzke, Marc)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/22/2019) (cf)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Island Railroad Company. (dnh)
August 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
August 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wietzke, Marc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Janice Alley. (Wietzke, Marc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17414167)Document filed by Janice Alley.(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alley v. Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Alley
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Represented By: Sean Patrick Constable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: Andrew G. Muccigrosso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?