Bernstein et al v. Cengage Learning, Inc.
Plaintiff: Elaine Ingulli, Terry Halbert, Ross Parke, Edward Roy, Louis Penner and Douglas Bernstein
Defendant: Cengage Learning, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07541
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Conference Requesting Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from James F. Rittinger dated October 10, 2019. Document filed by Cengage Learning, Inc..(Rittinger, James)
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Other Affiliate KKR Asset Management for Cengage Learning, Inc.. Document filed by Cengage Learning, Inc..(Edwards, Glenn)
September 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Glenn Charles Edwards to RE-FILE Document #18 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Frederick Rittinger on behalf of Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Rittinger, James)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Philbrick McArdle on behalf of Cengage Learning, Inc.. (McArdle, Jennifer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew L. Fish on behalf of Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Fish, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. for Cengage Learning, Inc.. Document filed by Cengage Learning, Inc..(Edwards, Glenn) Modified on 9/11/2019 (ldi).
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Glenn Charles Edwards on behalf of Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Edwards, Glenn)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #10 Motion for Steven Gerald Sklaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/4/2019) (rj)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by the parties to the above- captioned action, that the time for defendant Cengage Learning, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to October 10, 2019. Cengage Learning, Inc. answer due 10/10/2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/3/2019) (rj)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Jennifer Philbrick McArdle dated August 30, 2019 re: Enclosed Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint)(McArdle, Jennifer)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE: granting #11 Motion for Rohit Dwarka Nath to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/28/2019) (ama)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chanler Ashton Langham on behalf of Douglas Bernstein, Terry Halbert, Elaine Ingulli, Ross Parke, Louis Penner, Edward Roy. (Langham, Chanler)
August 27, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Steven Gerald Sklaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17496142. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #11 MOTION for Rohit Dwarka Nath to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17496157. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Rohit Dwarka Nath to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17496157. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Douglas Bernstein, Terry Halbert, Elaine Ingulli, Ross Parke, Louis Penner, Edward Roy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rohit D. Nath, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nath, Rohit)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Steven Gerald Sklaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17496142. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Douglas Bernstein, Terry Halbert, Elaine Ingulli, Ross Parke, Louis Penner, Edward Roy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Steven G. Sklaver, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sklaver, Steven)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Cengage Learning, Inc. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. Service was accepted by Raemi Wood, Senior Counsel. Document filed by Ross Parke; Edward Roy; Douglas Bernstein; Terry Halbert; Elaine Ingulli; Louis Penner. (Srinivasan, Kalpana)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE: granting #4 Motion for Kalpana Srinivasan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/19/2019) (ama)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arun Srinivas Subramanian on behalf of Douglas Bernstein, Terry Halbert, Elaine Ingulli, Ross Parke, Louis Penner, Edward Roy. (Subramanian, Arun)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cengage Learning, Inc.. (dnh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cengage Learning, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Bernstein, Terry Halbert, Elaine Ingulli, Ross Parke, Louis Penner, Edward Roy. (Srinivasan, Kalpana)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kalpana Srinivasan to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; caption must match exactly as pleading, if all plaintiffs do not fit, list leading plaintiff followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
August 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
August 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kalpana Srinivasan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kalpana Srinivasan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Douglas Bernstein; Elaine Ingulli; Terry Halbert; Edward Roy; Louis Penner. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
August 13, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Kalpana Srinivasan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #4 MOTION for Kalpana Srinivasan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17415526, paid on 8/12/2019. (wb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Kalpana Srinivasan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Douglas Bernstein, Terry Halbert, Elaine Ingulli, Ross Parke, Louis Penner, Edward Roy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cengage Learning, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Bernstein, Terry Halbert, Elaine Ingulli, Ross Parke, Louis Penner, Edward Roy. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) Modified on 8/13/2019 (sj).
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Srinivasan, Kalpana)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17415526)Document filed by Ross Parke, Edward Roy, Douglas Bernstein, Terry Halbert, Elaine Ingulli, Louis Penner.(Srinivasan, Kalpana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernstein et al v. Cengage Learning, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Ingulli
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: Rohit Nath
Represented By: Arun Srinivas Subramanian
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Represented By: Chanler Ashton Langham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Halbert
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: Rohit Nath
Represented By: Arun Srinivas Subramanian
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Represented By: Chanler Ashton Langham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Parke
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: Rohit Nath
Represented By: Arun Srinivas Subramanian
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Represented By: Chanler Ashton Langham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Roy
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: Rohit Nath
Represented By: Arun Srinivas Subramanian
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Represented By: Chanler Ashton Langham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Penner
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: Rohit Nath
Represented By: Arun Srinivas Subramanian
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Represented By: Chanler Ashton Langham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Bernstein
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: Rohit Nath
Represented By: Arun Srinivas Subramanian
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Represented By: Chanler Ashton Langham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cengage Learning, Inc.
Represented By: James Frederick Rittinger
Represented By: Andrew L. Fish
Represented By: Jennifer Philbrick McArdle
Represented By: Glenn Charles Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?