Peralta v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Elvis Peralta
Defendant: John or Jane Doe 1-10, in their official capacities, CITY OF NEW YORK, Daniel Castillo, Peter Valentin, in his official capacity, Det. Peter Valentin, Daniel Castillo, in his official capacity, John or Jane Doe 1-10 and Peter Valentin
Case Number: 1:2019cv07565
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter William Brocker on behalf of City of New York. (Brocker, Peter)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Daniel Castillo served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Daniel Castillo served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; City of New York served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; Peter Valentin(in their official capacity as New York City police officers) served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Peter Valentin(individually) served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. Service was accepted by Lemar Reid and Investigator Samson. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Elvis Peralta. (Depaola, Samuel)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Depaola, Samuel)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Daniel Castillo, Daniel Castillo, City of New York, John or Jane Doe 1-10, John or Jane Doe 1-10, Peter Valentin(in their official capacity as New York City police officers), Peter Valentin(individually). Document filed by Elvis Peralta.(Depaola, Samuel)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel Castillo, Daniel Castillo, City of New York, Peter Valentin(in their official capacity as New York City police officers), Peter Valentin(individually). (sj)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Samuel Christopher Depaola to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Samuel Christopher Depaola. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City of New York; Daniel Castillo; Peter Valentin; John or Jane Doe 1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; party text contained a typographical error. (sj)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Elvis Peralta.(Depaola, Samuel)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, Daniel Castillo, Peter Valentin, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elvis Peralta. (Depaola, Samuel)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF NEW YORK, Daniel Castillo, Daniel Castillo, in his official capacity, John or Jane Doe 1-10, John or Jane Doe 1-10, in their official capacities, Peter Valentin, Peter Valentin, in his official capacity. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17421083)Document filed by Elvis Peralta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Depaola, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peralta v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe 1-10, in their official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Peter William Brocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Valentin, in his official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Peter Valentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Castillo, in his official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Valentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvis Peralta
Represented By: Samuel Christopher Depaola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?