Lee v. Americanpearl.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: C.K. Lee
Defendant: Americanpearl.com, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07622
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Referring Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2020. Deposition due by 12/31/2020. All expert discovery, including disclosures, reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions shall be completed by 4/30/2021. Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Status Conference set for 5/7/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/6/2020) (rro)
March 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vernon S. Broderick: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/6/2020. (Court Reporter Jennifer Thune) (msa)
March 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rony Guldmann on behalf of C.K. Lee..(Guldmann, Rony)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney for Plaintiff William M. Brown is terminated from the case docket and removed from future ECF notifications. (Attorney William Michael Brown terminated.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/3/2020) (rro)
March 2, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Daniel Needham, Esq. dated 3/2/20 re: Joint Pre-Conference Letter and Proposed CMP. Document filed by C.K. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed CMP).(Needham, Daniel)
February 27, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIRMATION of William Brown in Support re: #15 MOTION for William Brown to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by C.K. Lee..(Brown, William)
February 27, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for William Brown to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by C.K. Lee..(Brown, William)
February 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Thomas King on behalf of Americanpearl.com, Inc...(King, Evan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Christian Needham on behalf of C.K. Lee..(Needham, Daniel)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/6/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/25/2020) (rro)
February 20, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Deborah A. Batts is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Melissa Seelig on behalf of C.K. Lee. (Seelig, Anne)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 24B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Deborah A. Batts and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 12/5/2019) (rro)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Americanpearl.com, Inc..(Asnen, Neil)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Americanpearl.com, Inc..(Asnen, Neil)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Americanpearl.com, Inc. answer due 1/2/2020.) (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 12/3/2019) (rro)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Neil Asnen dated 11/27/19. Document filed by Americanpearl.com, Inc..(Asnen, Neil)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Americanpearl.com, Inc. served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty (Secretary of State). Document filed by C.K. Lee. (Lee, C.K.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Americanpearl.com, Inc.. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Brown, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Americanpearl.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by C.K. Lee. (Brown, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Americanpearl.com, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17429843)Document filed by C.K. Lee.(Brown, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Americanpearl.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.K. Lee
Represented By: William Michael Brown
Represented By: Anne Melissa Seelig
Represented By: Rony Guldmann
Represented By: Daniel Christian Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americanpearl.com, Inc.
Represented By: Neil E. Asnen
Represented By: Evan Thomas King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?