Conklin v. Thomas
Plaintiff: Ms. Patricia Conklin and Patricia Conklin
Defendant: Mr. Charles Thomas, Jr. and Charles Thomas, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07656
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/3/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/10/2019) (kv)
August 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John M. Downing, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Dollar Demand $75,000,000; County code Rockland; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $75,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
August 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Charles Thomas, Jr.(Downing, John)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Downing, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Rule 7.1 Statement served on Plaintiff on August 15, 2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Charles Thomas, Jr. (Downing, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Rockland. Case Number: 030984/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17434891).Document filed by Charles Thomas, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summon and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Verified Answer)(Downing, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conklin v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Charles Thomas, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Downing, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Thomas, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Downing, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Patricia Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?