Pena v. Kauker
Plaintiff: Mr. Jose Pena and Jose Pena
Defendant: Mr. Michael Kauker and Michael Kauker
Case Number: 1:2019cv07665
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. WHEREAS, Defendant makes no argument that it was unjust to remand this matter. Defendant will suffer no prejudice as, per Defendant's letter, the time to file the notice of removal will not expire until September 9, 2019; it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. This case is closed and no further filings should be made under this docket number. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to waive the filing fee upon presentation of this order should Defendant seek to file a new notice of removal to open a new case. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/29/2019) (cf)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Removal addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from John M. Downing, Jr. dated August 28, 2019. Document filed by Michael Kauker.(Downing, John)
August 21, 2019 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 22 1000 3434 on 8/22/2019. (cf)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the matter is summarily remanded to state court. Defendant's Notice of Removal is procedurally defective. Pursuant to section 1447(c), the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a certified copy of this Opinion and Order to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County. The Clerk of Court is further directed to close the case. (As further et forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/21/2019) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney John M. Downing to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. NOTE: The incorrect Defendant was listed on the PDF. (ldi)
August 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John M. Downing, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $500,000,000; County code Rockland; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $500,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
August 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Rule 7.1 Statement served on Plaintiff on August 15, 2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Michael Kauker. (Downing, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Michael Kauker.(Downing, John) Modified on 8/18/2019 (ldi).
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Downing, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Rockland. Case Number: 033738/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17435216).Document filed by Michael Kauker.(Downing, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pena v. Kauker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Michael Kauker
Represented By: John M. Downing, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kauker
Represented By: John M. Downing, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jose Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?