Kelly v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Plaintiff: John J Kelly and John J. Kelly
Defendant: Metr-North Commuter Railroad Company and Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv07667
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Complaint. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company.(Muraidekh, Alan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company.(Muraidekh, Alan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. Service was accepted by Alison Pactong, Legal Secretary. Document filed by John J. Kelly. (Chiatto, Elizabeth)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, December 6, 2019 at 3:15pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules, the parties are hereby ORDERED to ECF file a Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order no later than seven days prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order available at the Court's website (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Nathan). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that included with the Proposed Civil Case Management Plan, the parties jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. (Initial Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/28/19) (yv)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company. Document filed by John J. Kelly.(Lauriello, Valerie)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company. (vf)
August 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (vf)
August 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (vf)
August 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Valerie J. Lauriello to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error; signature of the attorney ECF filing user not provided. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
August 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Valerie J. Lauriello. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Metr-North Commuter Railroad Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (vf)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lauriello, Valerie)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John J Kelly. (Lauriello, Valerie)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17436135)Document filed by John J Kelly.(Lauriello, Valerie) Modified on 8/16/2019 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J Kelly
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Kelly
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metr-North Commuter Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Represented By: Alan Muraidekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?