Thomas et al v. Martin-Gibbons et al
Plaintiff: Suzzette Thomas, Jose Ortiz, Joshua B. Ortiz, Tiesha Ortiz and J.O.
Defendant: The Children's Law Center, Robert D. Mulray, The City of New York, The State of New York, Carl Joseph Haynes, Martha Schneiderman, Patricia L. Martin-Gibbons, Esq., Vinola Wilson and Dana J. Wilson-Haynes
Case Number: 1:2019cv07695
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Barbara C Moses
Referring Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 34 AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE of Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference as Per Barbara Moses, U.S. Mag. Judge served on Patricia Martin-Gibbons, Esq. on 10/4/19. Service was accepted by Patricia Martin-Gibbons, Esq. Document filed by Jose Ortiz, Tiesha Ortiz, Suzzette Thomas. (sc)
October 8, 2019 Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Suzette Thomas, Tiesha Ortiz, Joshua B. Ortiz, Jose Ortiz dated 10/7/19 re: FRCP RULE 5(b) RULE 12(b)(6) FEDERAL LOCUS STANDI REBUTTAL RESPOND. Document filed by J.O., Jose Ortiz, Tiesha Ortiz, Suzzette Thomas.(sc)
October 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/11/2019 (kv)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Letter Motion for Conference. All defendants who have already requested a conference for an anticipated motion to dismiss will be heard at the October 18, 2019 pre-motion conference. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' letters is now due October 11, 2019. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions, docs. 23, 28, and 29 in 19 cv-7695 and docs. 21, 24, and 27 in 19-cv-7887. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/1/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (kv) Modified on 10/2/2019 (kv).
September 30, 2019 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE upon Carl Joseph Haynes. Document filed by Suzzette Thomas. (rdz)
September 27, 2019 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Carl Joseph Haynes served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019; Dana J. Wilson-Haynes served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. Service was accepted by Dana J. Wilson Haynes. Document filed by J.O.; Tiesha Ortiz; Jose Ortiz; Suzzette Thomas. (sac)
September 27, 2019 Filing 29 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #8 Letter addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Janet Neustaetter dated 09/27/19. Document filed by Martha Schneiderman, The Children's Law Center.(Neustaetter, Janet)
September 27, 2019 Filing 28 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Wendy Shepps dated September 27, 2019. Document filed by Patricia L. Martin-Gibbons, Esq.(Shepps, Wendy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wendy Beth Shepps on behalf of Patricia L. Martin-Gibbons, Esq. (Shepps, Wendy)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (23 in 1:19-cv-07887-ER-BCM) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Philip S. Frank dated September 12, 2019. filed by The City of New York, The Department of Health, New York City Department of Correction, (22 in 1:19-cv-07695-ER-BCM) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Philip S. Frank dated September 12, 2019. filed by The City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: A pre-motion conference will be held in both case on October 18, 2019, at 10:30 AM. Plaintiffs are directed to respond to Defendants' letter by October 9, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/25/2019) ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ks)
September 24, 2019 Mailed a copy of #25 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, to Shanequa S. Ortiz P.O. Box 156 Bronx, NY 10452. (vba)
September 24, 2019 Mailed a copy of #25 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, to Jose Ortiz P.O. Box 156 Bronx, NY 10452; Suzzette Thomas P.O. Box 156 Bronx, NY 10452; Tiesha Ortiz P.O. Box 156 Bronx, NY 10452. (vba)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to Shanequa Ortiz, Suzzette Thomas, Tiesha Ortiz, and Jose Ortiz. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 9/23/2019) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. Motions referred to Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/20/2019) (kv)
September 19, 2019 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ya Li dated September 19, 2019. Document filed by The State of New York.(Li, Ya)
September 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so redesignated. (wb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Philip S. Frank dated September 12, 2019. Document filed by The City of New York.(Frank, Philip)
September 10, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Carl Joseph Haynes served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. Service was accepted by unnamed person at Monterey County, CA Sheriff's Office, Salina, CA 93906. Document filed by Suzzette Thomas. (sc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Dana J. Wilson-Haynes served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. Service was accepted by unnamed person at Monterey County, CA Sheriff's Office, Salinas, California. Document filed by Suzzette Thomas. (sc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ya Li dated September 10, 2019. Document filed by The State of New York.(Li, Ya)
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. The Children's Law Center served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. Service was accepted by unnamed person at Children's Law Center. Document filed by J.O.; Tiesha Ortiz; Jose Ortiz; Suzzette Thomas. (sc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Robert D. Mulray served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. Service was accepted by Judge Robert Mulroy at Family Court Clerk. Document filed by J.O.; Tiesha Ortiz; Jose Ortiz; Suzzette Thomas. (sc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Martha Schneiderman served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. Service was accepted by unnamed person at Children's Law Center. Document filed by Tiesha Ortiz; Jose Ortiz; Suzzette Thomas. (sc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. The City of New York served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. Service was accepted by unnamed person at NYC Law Department. Document filed by J.O.; Tiesha Ortiz; Jose Ortiz; Suzzette Thomas. (sc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. The State of New York served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. Service was accepted by unnamed person at Office of State of New York Attorney General, 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10003. Document filed by Suzzette Thomas. (sc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Dana J. Wilson-Haynes, served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. Service was accepted by Dana J. Wilson-Haynes. Service was also made by Mail. Document filed by J.O.; Tiesha Ortiz; Jose Ortiz; Suzzette Thomas. (sc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Vinola Wilson served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. Service was accepted by Vinola Wilson. Document filed by J.O.; Tiesha Ortiz; Jose Ortiz; Suzzette Thomas. (sc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Carl Joseph Haynes served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. Service was accepted by Carl Joseph Haynes. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by J.O.; Tiesha Ortiz; Jose Ortiz; Suzzette Thomas. (sc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Patricia L. Martin-Gibbons, Esq served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. Service was accepted by Patricia Martin-Gibbons. Document filed by J.O.; Tiesha Ortiz; Jose Ortiz; Suzzette Thomas. (sc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Janet Irene Neustaetter on behalf of Martha Schneiderman, The Children's Law Center. (Neustaetter, Janet)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Janet Neustaetter dated 09/06/2019 re: request pre-motion conference. Document filed by Martha Schneiderman, The Children's Law Center.(Neustaetter, Janet)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19CV7887. Document filed by Martha Schneiderman, The Children's Law Center.(Neustaetter, Janet)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: 1 Complaint, filed by Tiesha Ortiz, Jose Ortiz, Suzzette Thomas, Joshua B. Ortiz. It is hereby ordered that: (1) The parties shall refer to J.O. only by his initials in future filings in accordance with Rule 5.2(a);(2) Plaintiffs shall file an Amended Complaint by October 21, 2019 that conforms with Rule 5.2(a) by redacting any use of J.O.'s full name and date of birth and using instead his initials and birth year. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to amend the case caption to list only the initials of plaintiff J.O., leaving the name of the adult Jose Ortiz as is, and the Clerk is respectfully directed to remove the Complaint, ECF No. 1 from the docket and file it under seal. It is SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2019.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/19/2019) (kv) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carl Joseph Haynes, Patricia L. Martin-Gibbons, Esq, Robert D. Mulray, Martha Schneiderman, The Children's Law Center, The City of New York, The State of New York, Vinola Wilson, Dana J. Wilson-Haynes. (sac)
August 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sac)
August 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Martin-Gibbons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Children's Law Center
Represented By: Janet Irene Neustaetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Mulray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Philip Sebastian Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of New York
Represented By: Ya Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Joseph Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Schneiderman
Represented By: Janet Irene Neustaetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia L. Martin-Gibbons, Esq.
Represented By: Wendy Beth Shepps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinola Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana J. Wilson-Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzzette Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua B. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiesha Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?