Cummings v. The City of New York et. al.
Plaintiff: Patricia Cummings
Defendant: The Hechinger Report, Lenard Larry McKelvey, Angel Martinez, Coalition of Educational Justice, New York Daily News, John Doe and Jane Doe 1-100, Kevin S. Parker, Natasha Capers, Dr. Andre Perry, WWPR-FM (105.1 MHZ), Jumaane D. Williams, The City of New York, Daniel Dromm, Ben Chapman, Giulia Cox, Clear Channel Communications, Inc., Courtney Ware, iHeartMedia, Hechinger Institute on Education and the Media, New York City Department of Education, City of New York Office of Special Investigations, Mayor Bill De Blasio and Charlamagne Tha God
Case Number: 1:2019cv07723
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 72 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on behalf of all defendants addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Cynthia E. Neidl, Esq. dated October 17, 2019. Document filed by Lenard Larry McKelvey.(Neidl, Cynthia)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/10/2019) (rro)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #53 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Counsel, your time ran 10 days ago and you did not ask for an extension to deal with your alleged copier issue. I don't care about your trial schedule. You blew this. Rather than subject you to a malpractice suit, I will accept your papers. I will never do so again. Meet your deadlines. If you need an extension ask - but don't assume that I will grant it. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/8/2019) (mml)
October 8, 2019 Filing 69 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Cynthia E. Neidl dated October 8, 2019 re: #53 THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to four (4) motions to dismiss made by various defendants to October 7, 2019, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Thomas F. Liotti, Esq. dated October 7, 2019. . Document filed by Lenard Larry McKelvey. (Neidl, Cynthia)
October 8, 2019 Filing 68 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Joseph Lawlor dated October 8, 2019 re: #53 THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to four (4) motions to dismiss made by various defendants to October 7, 2019, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Thomas F. Liotti, Esq. dated October 7, 2019. . Document filed by Andre Perry, The Hechinger Report. (Lawlor, Joseph)
October 7, 2019 Filing 67 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Aliza J. Balog dated October 7, 2019 re: #53 THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to four (4) motions to dismiss made by various defendants to October 7, 2019, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Thomas F. Liotti, Esq. dated October 7, 2019. . Document filed by City of New York Office of Special Investigations, Giulia Cox, Bill De Blasio, Daniel Dromm, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York, Courtney Ware, Jumaane D. Williams. (Balog, Aliza)
October 7, 2019 Filing 66 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from James Rosenfeld dated October 7, 2019 re: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Ben Chapman, New York Daily News.(Rosenfeld, James)
October 7, 2019 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT of Patricia Cummings in Opposition re: #27 . Document filed by Patricia Cummings. (Liotti, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #27 to Hechinger Institute On Education And The Media and Dr. Andre Perry's motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Document filed by Patricia Cummings. (Liotti, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Thomas F. Liotti, Esq. in Opposition re: #27 . Document filed by Patricia Cummings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A: Redacted copy of Office of Special Investigations Investigative Report (OSI) dated July 24, 2018, #2 Exhibit Ex B: Plaintiff's redacted rebuttal correspondence addressed to Community Superintendent Maribel Torres-Hulla dated October 5, 2018, #3 Exhibit Ex C: Plaintiff's Verified Complaint dated May 15, 2019 (without its exhibits), #4 Exhibit Ex C-1: Exhibits to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint dated May 15, 2019)(Liotti, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT of Patricia Cummings in Opposition re: #28 . Document filed by Patricia Cummings. (Liotti, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #28 to Lenard Larry McKelvey a/k/a Charlamagne Tha God motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Document filed by Patricia Cummings. (Liotti, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Thomas F. Liotti, Esq. in Opposition re: #28 . Document filed by Patricia Cummings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A: Redacted copy of Office of Special Investigations Investigative Report (OSI) dated July 24, 2018, #2 Exhibit Ex B: Plaintiff's redacted rebuttal correspondence addressed to Community Superintendent Maribel Torres-Hulla dated October 5, 2018, #3 Exhibit Ex C: Plaintiff's Verified Complaint dated May 15, 2019 (without its exhibits), #4 Exhibit Ex C-1: Exhibits to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint dated May 15, 2019)(Liotti, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 59 AFFIDAVIT of Patricia Cummings in Opposition re: #31 . Document filed by Patricia Cummings. (Liotti, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #31 to Daily News, LP, and Ben Chapman motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Document filed by Patricia Cummings. (Liotti, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Thomas F. Liotti, Esq. in Opposition re: #31 . Document filed by Patricia Cummings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A: Plaintiff's rebuttal correspondence addressed to Community Superintendent Maribel Torres-Hulla dated October 5, 2018, #2 Exhibit Ex B: Plaintiff's Verified Complaint dated May 15, 2019 (without its exhibits), #3 Exhibit Ex B-1: Exhibits to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint dated May 15, 2019)(Liotti, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT of Patricia Cummings in Opposition re: #29 . Document filed by Patricia Cummings. (Liotti, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #29 to Department of Education and City of New York Defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Document filed by Patricia Cummings. (Liotti, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Thomas F. Liotti, Esq. in Opposition re: #29 . Document filed by Patricia Cummings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A: Plaintiff's rebuttal correspondence addressed to Community Superintendent Maribel Torres-Hulla dated October 5, 2018, #2 Exhibit Ex B: Plaintiff's Verified Complaint dated May 15, 2019 (without its exhibits), #3 Exhibit Ex B-1: Exhibits to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint dated May 15, 2019, #4 Exhibit Ex C: Opinion and Award of the American Arbitration Association dated June 19, 2019)(Liotti, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 53 THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to four (4) motions to dismiss made by various defendants to October 7, 2019, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Thomas F. Liotti, Esq. dated October 7, 2019. Document filed by Patricia Cummings.(Liotti, Thomas)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 9/27/2019 Replies due by 10/23/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/20/2019) (mml)
September 20, 2019 Filing 51 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply for an additional one (1) week on behalf of the plaintiff to and including September 27, 2019, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Thomas F. Liotti, Esq. dated September 20, 2019. Document filed by Patricia Cummings.(Liotti, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/9/2019) (mml)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #46 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/9/2019) (mml)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #44 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/9/2019) (mml)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #43 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. OK. Replies due by 10/23/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/9/2019) (mml)
September 9, 2019 Filing 46 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Richard D. Rochford dated September 9, 2019. Document filed by Andre Perry, The Hechinger Report.(Lawlor, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Filing 45 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 Response to Motion,, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Cynthia E. Neidl dated September 9, 2019. Document filed by Lenard Larry McKelvey.(Neidl, Cynthia)
September 6, 2019 Filing 44 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Amanda Levine dated 9/6/2019. Document filed by Ben Chapman, New York Daily News.(Levine, Amanda)
September 6, 2019 Filing 43 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Aliza J. Balog dated September 6, 2019. Document filed by City of New York Office of Special Investigations, Giulia Cox, Bill De Blasio, Daniel Dromm, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York, Courtney Ware, Jumaane D. Williams.(Balog, Aliza)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. OK - No more extensions. Responses due by 9/20/2019 Replies due by 10/9/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/5/2019) (mml)
September 5, 2019 Filing 41 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Aliza J. Balog dated September 5, 2019 re: #40 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to four (4) motions to dismiss made by various defendants to and includng September 20, 2019, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Thomas F. Liotti, Esq. dated September 4, . Document filed by City of New York Office of Special Investigations, Giulia Cox, Bill De Blasio, Daniel Dromm, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York, Courtney Ware, Jumaane D. Williams. (Balog, Aliza)
September 4, 2019 Filing 40 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to four (4) motions to dismiss made by various defendants to and includng September 20, 2019, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Thomas F. Liotti, Esq. dated September 4, 2019. Document filed by Patricia Cummings.(Liotti, Thomas)
August 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/6/2019. Replies due by 9/25/2019. (mml)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER terminating #38 Letter Motion to Reopen. Proposed briefing schedule acceptable. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/27/2019) (mml) Modified on 10/16/2019 (mml).
August 23, 2019 Filing 38 LETTER MOTION to Reopen Briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Aliza J. Balog dated August 23, 2019. Document filed by City of New York Office of Special Investigations, Giulia Cox, Bill De Blasio, Daniel Dromm, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York, Courtney Ware, Jumaane D. Williams.(Balog, Aliza)
August 20, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Brooke Levine on behalf of Ben Chapman, New York Daily News. (Levine, Amanda)
August 19, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Michael Schwartz on behalf of Kevin S. Parker. (Schwartz, John)
August 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
August 19, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
August 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
August 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 19, 2019 Filing 35 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 2:19-cv-01664. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Change Venue - The motion to change venue, DE #8 , is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer the case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 8/14/2019. (Tirado, Chelsea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply - The Court finds that disposition of the motions to dismiss is best delayed until after the motion to transfer has been decided. Accordingly, the motions to dismiss #27 , #28 , #29 , and #31 are held in abeyance, and terminated for administrative reasons, pending determination of the motion to transfer. Plaintiffs motion #33 is granted to the extent that briefing schedules will be reset after a decision on the transfer motion has been issued. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 8/6/2019. (Tirado, Chelsea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 33 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 Letter, #31 MOTION to Dismiss , #27 MOTION to Dismiss , #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Patricia Cummings. (Liotti, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11716232. by Lenard Larry McKelvey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice) (Grygiel, Michael)[Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.] Modified on 8/19/2019 (sjo).
July 22, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss by Ben Chapman, New York Daily News. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Cover Letter) (Rosenfeld, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 30 Letter re: Motion to Dismiss by City of New York Office of Special Investigations, Giulia Cox, Daniel Dromm, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York, Courtney Ware, Jumaane D. Williams, Bill de Blasio (Balog, Aliza) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of New York Office of Special Investigations, Giulia Cox, Daniel Dromm, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York, Courtney Ware, Jumaane D. Williams, Bill de Blasio. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Aliza J. Balog, #3 Exhibit A (Redacted OSI Investigative Report), #4 Exhibit B (Transcript of Press Conference), #5 Exhibit C (Notice of Claim)) (Balog, Aliza) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lenard Larry McKelvey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit No. 1 (Declaration of Counsel), #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit No. 2 (Memorandum of Law), #5 Exhibit No. 3 (Memorandum of Law), #6 Transmittal Cover Letter to Judge Feuerstein) (Neidl, Cynthia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Andre Perry, The Hechinger Report. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Memorandum in Support) (Rochford, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 Letter Cover Letter Re: Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by New York Daily News (Rosenfeld, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 *AMENDED* Corporate Disclosure Statement by New York Daily News identifying Corporate Parent Tribune Publishing Company, Other Affiliate Merrick Media, LLC, Other Affiliate Merrick Venture Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Michael W. Ferro, Jr., Other Affiliate Nant Capital LLC, Other Affiliate Dr. Patrick Soon-Shiong, Other Affiliate California Capital Equity, LLC for New York Daily News. (Rosenfeld, James) Modified docket entry on 7/2/2019 to reflect that this is an amendment to DE #22 . (Tirado, Chelsea). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 Letter Cover Letter Re: Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Lenard Larry McKelvey (Neidl, Cynthia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 Letter Cover Letter Re: Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by City of New York Office of Special Investigations, Giulia Cox, Daniel Dromm, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York, Courtney Ware, Jumaane D. Williams, Bill de Blasio (Balog, Aliza) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New York Daily News identifying Other Affiliate New DN Company for New York Daily News. (Rosenfeld, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James Eric Rosenfeld on behalf of Ben Chapman, New York Daily News (aty to be noticed) (Rosenfeld, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura R Handman on behalf of Ben Chapman, New York Daily News (aty to be noticed) (Handman, Laura) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 Letter Cover Letter to Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Andre Perry, The Hechinger Report (Lawlor, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #13 Complaint,,,,, by Kevin S. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Nese, Dorothy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The number of pages in Plaintiff's opposition papers may be similarly enlarged. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 6/27/2019. (Disbrow, Sandra) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by City of New York Office of Special Investigations, Giulia Cox, Daniel Dromm, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York, Courtney Ware, Jumaane D. Williams, Bill de Blasio. (Balog, Aliza) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendant Kevin S. Parker to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 7/1/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/6/2019. (Georgescu, Dora) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendants Andre Perry and The Hechinger Report to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 7/1/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/6/2019. (Georgescu, Dora) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin S. Parker re #15 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Complaint,,,,, (Nese, Dorothy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Complaint,,,,, by Kevin S. Parker. (Nese, Dorothy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Complaint,,,,, by Andre Perry, The Hechinger Report. (Rochford, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Verified Complaint with Exhibits against All Plaintiffs Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Patricia Cummings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Daily News Cover February 2, 2018, #2 Exhibit B - Dailt News Article February 1, 2018 Bronx Teacher Sparks OutRage for Using Black Students in Cruel Slavery Lesson, #3 Exhibit C - Daily News Article April 9, 2018 Thousands Sign Paerent's Petition Demanding Action from deBlasio on Racist School Incidents, #4 Exhibit D - Daily News Article April 26, 2018 City to Spend $23 M for Anti-Bias Training for Public School Educators, #5 Exhibit E - Daily News Articles July 9, 2018 and July 10, 2018 Bronx Rducators Accused of Racism Still Under Investigation, Still on Payroll and Race-Flap Educators Not Slapped, #6 Exhibit F - Daily News Article August 11, 2018 City Completes Probe of Teacher in 'Slavery' Controversy, #7 Exhibit G - Daily News Article September 27, 2018, #8 Exhibit H - Daily News Article October 4, 2018 'Slave Teach Hit for 'Judgment', #9 Exhibit I - Daily News Articles October 20, 2018 and October 19, 2018 Teacher Axed She Walked on Students for Slave Lesson and City Fires Bronx 'Slave' Teacher, #10 Exhibit J - Daily News Article March 9, 2019 Race-Rage Lesson) (Liotti, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorothy O. Nese on behalf of Kevin S. Parker (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Nese, Dorothy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting in part and denying in part DE #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. On consent, the deadline for Plaintiff to serve her Complaint is extended to and including 5/17/2019. Further, the deadline for Defendants, The City of New York, New York City Department of Education, City of New York Office of Special Investigations, NYC Mayor Bill deBlasio, Giulia Cox, Courtney Ware, Councilman Jumaane D. Williams, Councilman Daniel Dromm, Ben Chapman, New York Daily News, and Lenard Larry McKelvey a/k/a Charlamagne Tha God, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 7/1/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/22/2019. (Georgescu, Dora) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Patricia Cummings of Hearing pursuant to the directive of the Hon. Sandra J. Feuerstein of April 4, 2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Liotti, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Letter MOTION to Change Venue SDNY filed by Patricia Cummings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Opposition to Letter Motion: Copies of prejudicial publicity and comments by influential figures within the New York City Community) (Liotti, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD received from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk re Index #600747/2019. (Coleman, Laurie) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
April 4, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF. (Disbrow, Sandra) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION to Change Venue by City of New York Office of Special Investigations, Giulia Cox, Daniel Dromm, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York, Courtney Ware, Jumaane D. Williams, Bill de Blasio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Balog, Aliza) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time re:advising Court as to Stipulation filed in underlying case by Lenard Larry McKelvey (Neidl, Cynthia) Modified docket entry from letter to motion as per chambers request on 4/22/2019 (Tirado, Chelsea). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia E. Neidl on behalf of Lenard Larry McKelvey (aty to be noticed) (Neidl, Cynthia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Michael Grygiel. (Tirado, Chelsea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
March 26, 2019 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. Attorney Michael J. Grygiel if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Davis, Kimberly) Modified on 3/26/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2019: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Ben Chapman, New York Daily News (Leish, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
March 25, 2019 NOTICE:The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed (2 Page Form)Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions INCLUDING the NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page. Please use the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ben Chapman, New York Daily News from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 600747/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11313721). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons with Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit C - Consents to Removal) (Leish, Matthew) Modified on 3/26/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummings v. The City of New York et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hechinger Report
Represented By: Richard D. Rochford, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Craig Lawlor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenard Larry McKelvey
Represented By: Michael J Grygiel
Represented By: Cynthia E. Neidl
Represented By: Cynthia Evans Neidl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coalition of Educational Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Daily News
Represented By: James Eric Rosenfeld
Represented By: Laura R. Handman
Represented By: Matthew A. Leish
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe and Jane Doe 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin S. Parker
Represented By: John Michael Schwartz
Represented By: Dorothy O. Nese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Capers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Andre Perry
Represented By: Richard D. Rochford, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Craig Lawlor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WWPR-FM (105.1 MHZ)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jumaane D. Williams
Represented By: Aliza Jordana Balog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Aliza Jordana Balog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Dromm
Represented By: Aliza Jordana Balog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Chapman
Represented By: James Eric Rosenfeld
Represented By: Laura R. Handman
Represented By: Matthew A. Leish
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giulia Cox
Represented By: Aliza Jordana Balog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Channel Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Ware
Represented By: Aliza Jordana Balog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iHeartMedia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hechinger Institute on Education and the Media
Represented By: Richard D. Rochford, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Craig Lawlor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Aliza Jordana Balog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York Office of Special Investigations
Represented By: Aliza Jordana Balog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill De Blasio
Represented By: Aliza Jordana Balog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlamagne Tha God
Represented By: Michael J Grygiel
Represented By: Cynthia E. Neidl
Represented By: Cynthia Evans Neidl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Cummings
Represented By: Thomas F. Liotti
Represented By: Thomas Francis Liotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?