Toys "R" US, Inc. et al v. AMIC Trading (PTY) LTD
Plaintiff: Geoffrey, LLC and Toys 'R' US, Inc.
Defendant: AMIC Trading (PTY) LTD
Case Number: 1:2019cv07733
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Gregory T. Parks dated October 17, 2019 re: status update. Document filed by Geoffrey, LLC, Toys 'R' US, Inc..(Parks, Gregory)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
September 9, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Gregory T. Parks to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs Toys "R" Us, Inc. and Geoffrey, LLC. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17555604. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Cle. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Gregory T. Parks to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs Toys "R" Us, Inc. and Geoffrey, LLC. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17555604. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Geoffrey, LLC, Toys 'R' US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Parks, Gregory)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jawad B. Muaddi on behalf of Geoffrey, LLC, Toys 'R' US, Inc.. (Muaddi, Jawad)
August 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
August 19, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
August 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
August 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number: 3:19-cv-00596. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Case transferred to District of Southern District of New York. U.S. Bankruptcy documents transmitted electronically per Supplemental Order entered in USBC on 8/13/19 by Judge Phillips. (jtho, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Restricted Transcript of May 29, 2019 Hearing in US Bankruptcy Court. (jtho, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet with (Attachments: #1 USBC - 1, #2 USBC - 2, #3 USBC - 3, #4 USBC - 4, #5 USBC - 12, #6 USBC - 17, #7 USBC -18, #8 USBC - 21)(jtho, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER on June 17, 2019 the Court issued an order transferring this adversary proceeding to the United States District Court for Southern District of New York. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that this case be transferred to the U.S. District Court for Eastern District of Virginia for transfer to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by United States Bankruptcy Judge Keith L. Phillips on August 13, 2019. (jtho, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toys "R" US, Inc. et al v. AMIC Trading (PTY) LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Shane Williams
Represented By: Jawad B. Muaddi
Represented By: Gregory T. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toys 'R' US, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Shane Williams
Represented By: Jawad B. Muaddi
Represented By: Gregory T. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMIC Trading (PTY) LTD
Represented By: Stephan William Milo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?