State of New York et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York and Asian American Federation
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin K. McAleenan, ACTING DIR KENNETH T CUCCINELLI II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan, Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II and Ken Cuccinelli
Interested Party: National Council on Independent Living, Center for Public Representation, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, New York Civil Liberties Union, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, Mental Health America, Disability Rights Advocates, National Disability Rights Network, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, American Civil Liberties Union, National Federation of the Blind, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, United Spinal Association, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, American Association of People with Disabilities, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Asian Americans Advancing Justice/Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund/National Women's Law Center, Little Lobbyists, Disability Rights New York, The Arc of the United States, Economic Progress Institute, Boundless Immigration, Community Action Marin, Oasis Legal Services, Kids Forward, Fiscal Policy Institute, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration and Child Care Law Center
Amicus Curiae: Congressional Tri-Caucus, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging, American Medical Association, Justice in Aging, National Council on Aging, NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al., American College of Physicians, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, National Hispanic Council on Aging, Caring Across Generations, American Academy of Pediatrics, MAZON, Health Law Advocate et al., PHI, American Society on Aging, New York State American Academy of Pediatrics, American Public Health Association, American Academy of Nursing, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars and United States House of Representatives
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Case Number: 1:2019cv07777
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting (155) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:19-cv-07777-GBD; granting (191) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:19-cv-07993-GBD: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/5/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-07777-GBD, 1:19-cv-07993-GBD (jwh)
March 5, 2020 Filing 155 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Keri L. Berman dated March 5, 2020. Document filed by Ken Cuccinelli, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America..(Berman, Keri)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #152 Motion for Leave to File Document. Upon consideration of amici the United States House of Representatives' motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss, (ECF No. 152), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/4/20) (yv)
March 3, 2020 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #152 CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Brief of United States House of Representatives as Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss . . Document filed by United States House of Representatives. (Attachments: #1 Brief of United States House of Representatives as Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss).(Letter, Douglas)
March 3, 2020 Filing 152 CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Brief of United States House of Representatives as Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss . Document filed by United States House of Representatives..(Letter, Douglas)
March 3, 2020 Filing 151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Havemann on behalf of United States House of Representatives..(Havemann, William)
March 3, 2020 Filing 150 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Barry Tatelman on behalf of United States House of Representatives..(Tatelman, Todd)
March 3, 2020 Filing 149 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rene Kathawala on behalf of United States House of Representatives..(Kathawala, Rene)
March 3, 2020 Filing 148 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan Barbero on behalf of United States House of Representatives..(Barbero, Megan)
March 3, 2020 Filing 147 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Neal Letter on behalf of United States House of Representatives..(Letter, Douglas)
March 3, 2020 Filing 146 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Grogg on behalf of United States House of Representatives..(Grogg, Adam)
February 28, 2020 Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (140 in 1:19-cv-07777-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss ., (176 in 1:19-cv-07993-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York, City of New York, State of Connecticut, State of New York, State of Vermont. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-07777-GBD, 1:19-cv-07993-GBD.(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #143 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: consolidated opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/27/2020) (jca)
February 26, 2020 Filing 143 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: consolidated opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jonathan Hurwitz & Elena Goldstein dated February 26, 2020. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York, State of New York.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-07777-GBD, 1:19-cv-07993-GBD.(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Ming-Qi Chu and Jonathan H. Hurwitz dated February 14, 2020 re: letter requesting consolidation. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/18/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-07777-GBD, 1:19-cv-07993-GBD (ks)
February 14, 2020 Filing 141 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #140 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America..(Kolsky, Joshua)
February 14, 2020 Filing 140 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. Responses due by 2/28/2020.(Kolsky, Joshua)
February 14, 2020 Filing 139 LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-7993; 19-cv-7777 addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Plaintiffs dated February 14, 2020. Document filed by State of New York..(Chu, Ming-Qi)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #137 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/12/2020) (mro)
February 12, 2020 Filing 137 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Keri L. Berman dated February 12, 2020. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security..(Berman, Keri)
January 31, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II answer due 2/14/2020; Kevin K. McAleenan answer due 2/14/2020; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answer due 2/14/2020; United States Department of Homeland Security answer due 2/14/2020; United States of America answer due 2/14/2020. Motions due by 2/14/2020. Responses due by 2/28/2020. Replies due by 3/6/2020. Status Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (jwh)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying #121 Letter Motion to Stay ; terminating #125 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference; denying as moot #133 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Defendants' motion to stay proceedings in this case until the Second Circuit has rendered a decision on Defendants' appeals of this Court's preliminary injunction orders, (ECF No. 121), is DENIED. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended from January 31, 2020 to February 14, 2020. Should Defendants file a motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' complaint, any response to such motion is due by February 28, 2020, and any reply in further support of such motion is due by March 6, 2020. A conference is scheduled for March 17, 2020 at 10:30 am. The Clerk's Office is directed to close Defendants' letter motion dated January 28, 2020, (ECF No. 133), as moot. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/31/2020) (jwh)
January 30, 2020 Filing 135 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Keri L. Berman dated January 30, 2020 re: Defendants' Response to the Complaint. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America.(Berman, Keri)
January 28, 2020 Filing 134 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Plaintiffs dated January 28, 2020 re: #133 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Keri L. Berman dated January 28, 2020. . Document filed by State of New York. (Chu, Ming-Qi)
January 28, 2020 Filing 133 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Keri L. Berman dated January 28, 2020. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America.(Berman, Keri)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #116 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States of America, United States Department of Homeland Security. USCA Case Number 19-3591. In these related cases, Appellants move for stays pending their appeals of the district court's preliminary injunctions. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that Appellants' motions are DENIED. See U.S. Sec. & Exch. Comm'n v. Citigroup Global Mkts. Inc., 673 F.3d 158, 16263 (2d Cir. 2012) (explaining standard for stay pending appeal). The Court has set an expedited briefing schedule on the merits of the government's appeals, with the last brief due on February 14. Oral argument will be scheduled promptly thereafter. As always, the merits panel as soon as constituted has full authority to consider the scope of the existing injunction. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 01/08/2020. (nd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 131 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joshua M. Kolsky dated 12/20/2019 re: #125 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Elena Goldstein dated December 6, 2019. . Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Kolsky, Joshua)
December 20, 2019 Filing 130 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #121 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. . Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Berman, Keri)
December 20, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Keri Lane Berman on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Berman, Keri)
December 13, 2019 Filing 128 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #121 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. . Document filed by State of New York. (Meyer, Amanda)
December 6, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE of Ninth Circuit Order Staying Preliminary Injunctions. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kolsky, Joshua)
December 6, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE of Submission of Administrative Record. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Kolsky, Joshua)
December 6, 2019 Filing 125 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Elena Goldstein dated December 6, 2019. Document filed by State of New York.(Goldstein, Elena)
December 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II answer due 1/31/2020; Kevin K. McAleenan answer due 1/31/2020; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answer due 1/31/2020; United States Department of Homeland Security answer due 1/31/2020; United States of America answer due 1/31/2020. (rro)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended from December 9, 2019 to January 31, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/5/2019) (rro)
December 4, 2019 Filing 123 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joshua M. Kolsky dated 12/4/2019. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America.(Kolsky, Joshua)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying #111 Letter Motion to Stay. In short, to stay the injunction would be inconsistent with this Court's underlying findings of Plaintiffs' likelihood of success on the merits, and of the irreparable injury that Plaintiffs, noncitizens, and the general public would suffer in the absence of an effective injunction. Accordingly, Defendants' motion for a stay of the preliminary injunction pending appeal, (ECF No. 111), is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/2/2019) (kv)
November 29, 2019 Filing 121 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America.(Kolsky, Joshua)
November 18, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/7/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 18, 2019 Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 10/7/2019 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2020.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 8, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE of Waiver of Reply and Hearing re: #111 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Kolsky, Joshua)
November 8, 2019 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #111 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction. . Document filed by State of New York. (Meyer, Amanda)
October 31, 2019 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #116 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States of America, United States Department of Homeland Security were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
October 31, 2019 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #116 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,. (nd)
October 30, 2019 Appeal Fee Not Required for #116 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,. Appeal filed by U.S. Government. (nd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from #109 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,, #110 Order,. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Kolsky, Joshua)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendants' request for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint, (ECF No. 114), is GRANTED. Defendants' response is due by December 9, 2019. (Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II answer due 12/9/2019; Kevin K. McAleenan answer due 12/9/2019; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answer due 12/9/2019; United States Department of Homeland Security answer due 12/9/2019; United States of America answer due 12/9/2019.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/28/2019) (jwh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 114 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joshua M. Kolsky dated October 25, 2019. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America.(Kolsky, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Filing 113 DECLARATION of Daniel Renaud in Support re: #111 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Kolsky, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #111 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction. . Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Kolsky, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Filing 111 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America.(Kolsky, Joshua)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re: #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of New York: Plaintiffs' motion for issuance of a preliminary injunction, (ECF No. 33), is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/11/2019) (jwh)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION granting #33 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a), Defendants are RESTRAINED AND ENJOINED from: 1. Enforcing, applying or treating as effective, or allowing persons under their control to enforce, apply, or treat as effective, the Rule; and 2. Implementing, considering in connection with any application, or requiring the use of any new or updated forms whose submission would be required under the Rule, including the new Form I-944, titled "Declaration of Self Sufficiency," and the updated Form I-485, titled "Application to Register Permanent Residence of Adjust Status"; and, It is hereby FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 705, the effective date of the Rule is STAYED and POSTPONED sine die pending further Order of the Court such that, if this Order is later terminated and the Rule goes into effect, the Rule's stated effective date of October 15, 2019, as well as any references in the Rule to October 15, 2019, including but not limited those contained in proposed 8 CFR 212.20, 212.22(b)(4)(i)(E), 212.22(b)(4)(ii)(E)(1), 212.22(b)(4)(ii)(E)(2), 212.22(b)(4)(ii)(F), 212.22(c)(1)(ii), 212.22(d), 214.1, 248.1(a), and 248.1(c)(4), shall be replaced with a date after this Order is terminated. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/11/2019) (jwh)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #107 Motion for Denny Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/9/2019) (mro)
October 9, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #107 MOTION for Denny Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number ANYSDC-17576806. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 107 MOTION for Denny Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number ANYSDC-17576806. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Denny)
October 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #106 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (ad)
October 8, 2019 Filing 106 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by City of New York, State of Connecticut, State of New York, State of Vermont. Related Document Number: #33 . (Rosner, Abigail) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 10/7/2019 re: #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by State of New York. Plaintiff Counsel: Ming-Qi Chu, Elena Stacy Goldstein, Melanie Calandra, Cynthia C. Weaver Defense Counsel: Eric Soskin, Ethan Price Davis and Court Reporter present (Vega, Elizabeth)
October 6, 2019 Filing 105 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joshua M. Kolsky dated October 6, 2019 re: Correction to Rule. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kolsky, Joshua)
October 4, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Soskin on behalf of Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Soskin, Eric)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #100 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Upon consideration of amici the Immigration Reform Law Institute' s motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Defendants, (ECF No. 100), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/4/2019) (rro)
October 4, 2019 Filing 102 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by State of New York. (Goldstein, Elena)
October 3, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ethan Price Davis on behalf of Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Davis, Ethan)
October 1, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Amicus Brief)(Levy, Roger)
September 27, 2019 Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Kolsky, Joshua)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #96 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/24/2019) (ks)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #95 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/24/2019) (jca)
September 23, 2019 Filing 96 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joshua M. Kolsky dated September 23, 2019. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America.(Kolsky, Joshua)
September 23, 2019 Filing 95 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Elena Goldstein dated September 23, 2019. Document filed by State of New York.(Goldstein, Elena)
September 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #94 MOTION for Denny Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California; the filing fee was not paid;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (wb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 94 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Denny Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Denny) Modified on 9/20/2019 (wb).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #91 Motion for Elizabeth L. Stameshkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/20/2019) (cf)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #90 Motion for Susan M. Krumplitsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/20/2019) (cf)
September 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #91 MOTION for Elizabeth L. Stameshkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17632368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #91 MOTION for Elizabeth L. Stameshkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17632368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION for Elizabeth L. Stameshkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17632368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, American Medical Association, New York State American Academy of Pediatrics. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Stameshkin, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stameshkin, Elizabeth)
September 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #90 MOTION for Susan M. Krumplitsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17632263. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION for Susan M. Krumplitsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17632263. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, American Medical Association, New York State American Academy of Pediatrics. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan Krumplitsch, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Susan, Krumplitsch)
September 19, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julio A Thompson on behalf of State of Vermont. (Thompson, Julio)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #86 Motion to File Amicus Brief. Upon consideration of amici the American Academy of Pediatrics, the American Medical Association, the American College of Physicians, and the New York State American Academy of Pediatrics' motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 106), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/18/2019) (jca)
September 17, 2019 Filing 87 BRIEF re: #86 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . *Corrected* Proposed Brief. Document filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, American Medical Association, New York State American Academy of Pediatrics.(Kennelly, Kaitland)
September 17, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, American College of Physicians, New York State American Academy of Pediatrics. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennelly, Kaitland)
September 16, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 10/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (jwh)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #81 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Defendants' time to file an opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is extended to 12:00 pm on September 27, 2019. Plaintiffs' time to file any reply to Defendants' opposition is due by 12:00 pm on October 4, 2019. Oral argument will be held on Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction on October 7, 2019 at 10:00 am. The initial conference scheduled for September 24, 2019 at 10:30 am is canceled. (Responses due by 9/27/2019. Replies due by 10/4/2019.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/16/2019) (jwh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Victor Haohan Yu on behalf of NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al.. New Address: KEKER, VAN NEST & PETERS, 633 BATTERY STREET, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 94911, 415-391-5400. (Yu, Victor)
September 13, 2019 Filing 83 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Elena Goldstein dated September 13, 2019 re: #81 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joshua Kolsky dated September 13, 2019. . Document filed by State of New York. (Goldstein, Elena)
September 13, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Perry on behalf of State of Connecticut. (Perry, Joshua)
September 13, 2019 Filing 81 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joshua Kolsky dated September 13, 2019. Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America.(Kolsky, Joshua)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #77 Motion to File Amicus Brief: Upon consideration of amici the National Housing Law Project, the Food Research & Action Center, the Center for Law and Social Policy, and the other Housing, Nutrition, and Health-Focused Groups' motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 77), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/13/2019) (jwh)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #61 MOTION for Julio A. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/13/2019) (jca)
September 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #78 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
September 13, 2019 Filing 78 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al.. Related Document Number: #77 . (Yu, Victor) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 13, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief)(Yu, Victor)
September 12, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Filing of Corrected Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Elena Goldstein re: #34 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,,,,. Document filed by State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Declaration of David Dyssegaard Kallick (Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Elena Goldstein), #2 Redline Version of Declaration of David Dyssegaard Kallick)(Chu, Ming-Qi)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #50 MOTION for Wendy Ellen Parmet to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (jca)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #49 MOTION for Justin J. Lowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (jca)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #52 Motion for Andrew Paul Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (kv)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #59 Motion for Regan Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (kv)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #53 Motion for Emily Joanne Nash to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (kv)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #57 Motion for Kyle A. Virgien to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (ks)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #48 Motion for Kristyn Marie DeFilipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (rro)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #48 Motion for Kristyn M. DeFilipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (ks)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #56 Motion for Charles Ferer Sprague to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (ks)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #55 Motion for Sarah M. Ray to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (ks)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #51 Motion for Andrew London to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (ks)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #47 Motion to File Amicus Brief. Upon consideration of amici Members of Congress Judy Chu, Chair of the CAP AC, Adriano Espaillat, CHC Whip, Yvette D. Clarke, Chair of the CBC Immigration Task Force, Joaquin Castro, Chair of the CHC, Karen Bass, Chair of the CBC, Pramila Jayapal, Chair of the CAP AC Immigration Task Force, Barbara Lee, Co-Chair of the CAP AC Healthcare Task Force, et al.'s motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 4 7), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (rro)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #54 Motion to File Amicus Brief: Upon consideration of amici Health Law Advocates, Health Care For All, the Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law, Public Health Law Watch, and Health in Justice Action Lab, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, the Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, the California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, the California Immigrant Policy Center, the Kentucky Equal Justice Center, the Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, the Florida Health Justice Project, the Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, the New York Immigration Coalition, Community Healthcare Network, the Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, Treatment Action Group, Families USA, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., and Community Catalyst's motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 54), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (jwh)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #58 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief: Upon consideration of amici American Civil Liberties Union, Center for Public Representation, American Association of People with Disabilities, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, The Arc of United States, United Spinal Association, Disability Rights New York and New York Civil Liberties Union's motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 58), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (jwh)
September 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #61 MOTION for Julio A. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17589071. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for Julio A. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17589071. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Thompson, Julio)
September 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #59 MOTION for Regan Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17587865. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #39 Motion for Natalie Kean to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/11/2019) (jwh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Regan Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17587865. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bailey, Regan)
September 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #52 MOTION for Andrew Paul Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583616. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #56 MOTION for Charles Ferer Sprague to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17585334. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #57 MOTION for Kyle A. Virgien to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17585342. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #55 MOTION for Sarah M. Ray to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17585268. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 58 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Sarah M. Ray dated September 11, 2019. Document filed by American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Center for Public Representation, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights New York, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, New York Civil Liberties Union, The Arc of the United States, United Spinal Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae the American Civil Liberties Union, Center for Public Representation, et al. in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Ray, Sarah)
September 11, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for Kyle A. Virgien to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17585342. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Center for Public Representation, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights New York, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, New York Civil Liberties Union, The Arc of the United States, United Spinal Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kyle A. Virgien in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Virgien, Kyle)
September 11, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Charles Ferer Sprague to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17585334. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Center for Public Representation, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights New York, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, New York Civil Liberties Union, The Arc of the United States, United Spinal Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Charles Ferer Sprague in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sprague, Charles)
September 11, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Sarah M. Ray to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17585268. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Center for Public Representation, American Association of People with Disabilities, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights New York, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, New York Civil Liberties Union, The Arc of the United States, United Spinal Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sarah M. Ray in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ray, Sarah)
September 11, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by Health Law Advocate et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #53 MOTION for Emily Joanne Nash to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583657. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Emily Joanne Nash to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583657. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Law Advocate et al.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Andrew Paul Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583616. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Law Advocate et al.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #49 MOTION for Justin J. Lowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583392. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #48 MOTION for Kristyn Marie DeFilipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583210. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #50 MOTION for Wendy Ellen Parmet to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583428. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #51 MOTION for Andrew London to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583487. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Andrew London to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583487. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Law Advocate et al.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Wendy Ellen Parmet to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583428. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Law Advocate et al.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Justin J. Lowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583392. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Law Advocate et al.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Kristyn Marie DeFilipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583210. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Law Advocate et al.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by Congressional Tri-Caucus. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bullerjahn, Caroline)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to File Document. Upon consideration of amici Justice in Aging, American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, MAZON, and PHI's motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 40), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/11/2019) (kv)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. Upon consideration of amici Asian Americans Advancing Justice / AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, National Women's Law Center, and 57 other organizations' motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 43), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. So ordered. Granting #43 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jared A. Levine, Esq. dated 9/10/2019. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice/Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund/National Women's Law Center. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/11/2019) (rjm)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #37 Motion for Owen T. Masters to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/11/2019) (mro)
September 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #38 MOTION for Denny Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17576806. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
September 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #37 MOTION for Owen T. Masters to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17576640. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #39 MOTION for Natalie Kean to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17576922. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 43 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jared A. Levine, Esq. dated 9/10/2019. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice/Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund/National Women's Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed amicus brief)(Levine, Jared)
September 10, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Elise Li on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice/Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund/National Women's Law Center. (Li, Anne)
September 10, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jared Alexander Levine on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice/Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund/National Women's Law Center. (Levine, Jared)
September 10, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae . Document filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hirschhorn, Russell)
September 10, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Natalie Kean to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17576922. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kean, Natalie)
September 10, 2019 Filing 38 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Denny Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17576806. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Denny) Modified on 9/11/2019 (wb).
September 10, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Owen T. Masters to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17576640. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Masters, Owen)
September 10, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Russell Laurence Hirschhorn on behalf of Justice in Aging, American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, MAZON, PHI. (Hirschhorn, Russell)
September 9, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by State of New York. (Goldstein, Elena)
September 9, 2019 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Elena Goldstein in Support re: #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Ryan Allen, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Steven Banks, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Oxiris Barbot, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Lisa M. David, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Sabrina Fong, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Deidre S. Gifford, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Laura V. Gonzalez-Murphy, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Barbara C. Guinn, #9 Exhibit Declaration of David Dyssegaard Kallick, #10 Exhibit Declaration of Mitchell Katz, #11 Exhibit Declaration of Leighton Ku, #12 Exhibit Declaration of Martha Maksym, #13 Exhibit Declaration of Seila Mosquera-Bruno, #14 Exhibit Declaration of Bitta Mostofi, #15 Exhibit Declaration of John Paul Newton, #16 Exhibit Declaration of Diane Whitmore Schanzenbach, #17 Exhibit Declaration of RuthAnne Visnauskas, #18 Exhibit Declaration of Richard M. Williams, #19 Exhibit Declaration of Howard A. Zucker, #20 Exhibit American Civil Liberties Union Comment Letter, #21 Exhibit Asian Americans Advancing Justice Comment Letter, #22 Exhibit City of Chicago et al. Comment Letter, #23 Exhibit Disability Rights and Education & Defense Fund Comment Letter, #24 Exhibit Legal Aid Society Comment Letter, #25 Exhibit National Immigration Law Center Comment Letter, #26 Exhibit New York Department of Health Comment Letter, #27 Exhibit New York Department of State Comment Letter, #28 Exhibit New York Immigration Coalition Comment Letter, #29 Exhibit New York Office of Temporary and Disability Assistance Comment Letter, #30 Exhibit New York State Homes and Community Renewal Comment Letter, #31 Exhibit State of Virginia et al. Comment Letter)(Goldstein, Elena)
September 9, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by State of New York.(Goldstein, Elena)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The page limit for Plaintiffs' memorandum of law in support of their motion for a preliminary injunction is extended to 40 pages. The initial conference scheduled for September 24, 2019 at 9:30 am shall be held at 10:30 am. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/6/2019) (jca)
September 6, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (tro)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER terminating #28 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limit for Plaintiffs' memorandum of law in support of their motion for a preliminary injunction is extended to 40 pages. The initial conference scheduled for 9/24/2019 at 9:30 a.m. shall be held at 10:30 a.m. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/6/2019) (tro)
September 4, 2019 Filing 30 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joshua M. Kolsky dated September 4, 2019 re: #28 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Elena Goldstein dated September 3, 2019. . Document filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Kolsky, Joshua)
September 4, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Kolsky on behalf of Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Kolsky, Joshua)
September 3, 2019 Filing 28 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Elena Goldstein dated September 3, 2019. Document filed by State of New York.(Goldstein, Elena)
August 29, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Daniel Battles on behalf of State of Vermont. (Battles, Benjamin)
August 28, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. All Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by State of Connecticut, City of New York, State of New York, State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mailing Labels, #2 Exhibit Tracking information for United States of America, #3 Exhibit Tracking information for Kevin K. McAleenan, #4 Exhibit Tracking information for Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, #5 Exhibit Tracking information for United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, #6 Exhibit Tracking information for United States Department of Homeland Security, #7 Exhibit Tracking information for Civil-Process Clerk)(Rosner, Abigail)
August 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tonya Jenerette on behalf of City of New York. (Jenerette, Tonya)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/27/2019) (jwh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hope Lu on behalf of City of New York. (Lu, Hope)
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kevin K. McAleenan. (dnh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Doris F. Bernhardt on behalf of City of New York. (Bernhardt, Doris)
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melanie Calandra Teresa Ash on behalf of City of New York. (Ash, Melanie)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cynthia C. Weaver on behalf of City of New York. (Weaver, Cynthia)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin K. McAleenan, re: #17 Complaint,. Document filed by State of New York. (Colangelo, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 COMPLAINT against Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. Document filed by State of Connecticut, City of New York, State of New York, State of Vermont.(Colangelo, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Abigail Everett Rosner to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name in the 'To' field on the summons request PDF contains a typographical error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (pne)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (pne)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (pne)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II. (pne)
August 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Abigail Everett Rosner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:551; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:2201; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
August 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Abigail Everett Rosner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: State of New York, City of New York, State of Connecticut, State of Vermont, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (pne)
August 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Abigail Everett Rosner to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; all filers were selected for the pleading; the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
August 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ming-Qi Chu on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK. (Chu, Ming-Qi)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Marie Meyer on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK. (Meyer, Amanda)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VERMONT. (Rosner, Abigail)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, in his official capacity as Acting Director of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VERMONT. (Rosner, Abigail)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VERMONT. (Rosner, Abigail)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin K. McAleenan, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VERMONT. (Rosner, Abigail) Modified on 8/21/2019 (pne).
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VERMONT. (Rosner, Abigail)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elena Stacy Goldstein on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK. (Goldstein, Elena)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Colangelo on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK. (Colangelo, Matthew)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eleanor Laurel Pullin Spottswood on behalf of STATE OF VERMONT. (Spottswood, Eleanor)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosner, Abigail)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17457561)Document filed by STATE OF NEW YORK.(Rosner, Abigail) Modified on 8/21/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New York et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joshua Kolsky
Represented By: Eric Soskin
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Represented By: Keri Lane Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Joshua Kolsky
Represented By: Eric Soskin
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Represented By: Keri Lane Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTING DIR KENNETH T CUCCINELLI II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joshua Kolsky
Represented By: Eric Soskin
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Represented By: Keri Lane Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Joshua Kolsky
Represented By: Eric Soskin
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Represented By: Keri Lane Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II
Represented By: Joshua Kolsky
Represented By: Eric Soskin
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Represented By: Keri Lane Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Joshua Kolsky
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Represented By: Eric Soskin
Represented By: Keri Lane Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Doris F. Bernhardt
Represented By: Cynthia C. Weaver
Represented By: Hope Lu
Represented By: Tonya Jenerette
Represented By: Melanie Calandra Teresa Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Amanda Marie Meyer
Represented By: Ming-Qi Chu
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Abigail Everett Rosner
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF VERMONT
Represented By: Eleanor Laurel Pullin Spottswood
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Benjamin Daniel Battles
Represented By: Julio A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Joshua Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: African Services Committee
Represented By: Amy Bowles
Represented By: Kathleen Mary Kelleher
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Represented By: Hasan Shafiqullah
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Elana Rose Beale
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Steven Craig Herzog
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York)
Represented By: Amy Bowles
Represented By: Kathleen Mary Kelleher
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Represented By: Hasan Shafiqullah
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Elana Rose Beale
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Steven Craig Herzog
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Bowles
Represented By: Kathleen Mary Kelleher
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Represented By: Hasan Shafiqullah
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Elana Rose Beale
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Steven Craig Herzog
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Make the Road New York
Represented By: Amy Bowles
Represented By: Kathleen Mary Kelleher
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Represented By: Hasan Shafiqullah
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Elana Rose Beale
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Steven Craig Herzog
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asian American Federation
Represented By: Amy Bowles
Represented By: Kathleen Mary Kelleher
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Represented By: Hasan Shafiqullah
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Elana Rose Beale
Represented By: Steven Craig Herzog
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Council on Independent Living
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Center for Public Representation
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Autistic Self Advocacy Network
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: New York Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mental Health America
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Disability Rights Advocates
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Disability Rights Network
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Federation of the Blind
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United Spinal Association
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Association of University Centers on Disabilities
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: American Association of People with Disabilities
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Asian Americans Advancing Justice/Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund/National Women's Law Center
Represented By: Jared Alexander Levine
Represented By: Anne Elise Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Little Lobbyists
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Disability Rights New York
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Arc of the United States
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Economic Progress Institute
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Boundless Immigration
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Community Action Marin
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Oasis Legal Services
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kids Forward
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Fiscal Policy Institute
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Center for Law and Economic Justice
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Child Care Law Center
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Congressional Tri-Caucus
Represented By: Caroline Herman Bullerjahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Stameshkin
Represented By: Kaitland Mccann Kennelly
Represented By: Krumplitsch Susan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Justice in Aging
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Council on Aging
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al.
Represented By: Victor Haohan Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Physicians
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Stameshkin
Represented By: Kaitland Mccann Kennelly
Represented By: Krumplitsch Susan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Hispanic Council on Aging
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Caring Across Generations
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Stameshkin
Represented By: Kaitland Mccann Kennelly
Represented By: Krumplitsch Susan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MAZON
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Health Law Advocate et al.
Represented By: Kristyn DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHI
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Society on Aging
Represented By: Natalie Kean
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New York State American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Stameshkin
Represented By: Kaitland Mccann Kennelly
Represented By: Krumplitsch Susan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Public Health Association
Represented By: Phillip A Escoriaza
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Nursing
Represented By: Phillip A Escoriaza
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Deans, Chairs, and Scholars
Represented By: Phillip A Escoriaza
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States House of Representatives
Represented By: Adam Grogg
Represented By: Rene Kathawala
Represented By: Megan Barbero
Represented By: William Havemann
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Represented By: Todd Barry Tatelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Represented By: Roger A Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?